Mangatangi River Rock Limited was started on 31 Aug 2007 and issued a business number of 9429033162157. This registered LTD company has been managed by 12 directors: David Harding Randell - an active director whose contract started on 27 Jul 2015,
John Speer Wilson - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 Mar 2018 and was terminated on 28 Jan 2019,
Christopher Robert Darlow - an inactive director whose contract started on 27 Jul 2015 and was terminated on 05 Apr 2018,
Maryanne Green - an inactive director whose contract started on 02 Jul 2015 and was terminated on 31 Dec 2015,
Frances Kathleen Green - an inactive director whose contract started on 05 Dec 2011 and was terminated on 02 Jul 2015.
According to our information (updated on 06 Sep 2024), the company filed 1 address: P O Box 12 443, Penrose, Auckland, 1642 (type: postal, office).
Up until 23 Oct 2012, Mangatangi River Rock Limited had been using Leven 2, 8 Gloucester Park Road, Onehunga, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100000 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Hugh Green Group Lp (an other) located at Onehunga, Auckland postcode 1061.
Other active addresses
Address #4: Level 2, 8 Gloucester Park Road, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Office & delivery address used from 23 Oct 2019
Principal place of activity
Level 2, 8 Gloucester Park Road, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Leven 2, 8 Gloucester Park Road, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Registered address used from 16 Jul 2012 to 23 Oct 2012
Address #2: 107 Neilson Street, Onehunga, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 31 Aug 2007 to 16 Jul 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100000
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 13 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100000 | |||
Other (Other) | Hugh Green Group Lp |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
03 Apr 2020 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Green, Frances Kathleen |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
22 Jun 2017 - 03 Apr 2020 |
Individual | Green, Frances Kathleen |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
22 Jun 2017 - 03 Apr 2020 |
Individual | Green, John Patrick |
Rd 2 Papakura 2582 New Zealand |
22 Jun 2017 - 03 Apr 2020 |
Individual | Randell, David Harding |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
29 Jul 2015 - 03 Apr 2020 |
Individual | Scott, David Peter |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
26 Nov 2012 - 29 Jul 2015 |
Individual | Gosney, John James |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
21 Sep 2012 - 29 Jul 2015 |
Individual | Green, Maryanne |
Stanmore Bay Whangaparaoa 0932 New Zealand |
29 Jul 2015 - 22 Jun 2017 |
Individual | Green, Frances Kathleen |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
21 Mar 2012 - 29 Jul 2015 |
Individual | Green, John Patrick |
Rd 2 Papakura 2582 New Zealand |
21 Mar 2012 - 29 Jul 2015 |
Individual | Green, John Patrick |
Rd 2 Papakura 2582 New Zealand |
22 Jun 2017 - 03 Apr 2020 |
Individual | Carter, Robert William |
Tauriko Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
17 Oct 2011 - 21 Sep 2012 |
Individual | Green, Hugh |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
31 Aug 2007 - 20 Jul 2012 |
Individual | Fisher, Michael John |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
03 Apr 2012 - 29 Jul 2015 |
Individual | Darlow, Christopher Robert |
Torbay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
29 Jul 2015 - 03 Apr 2020 |
Individual | Randell, David Harding |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
29 Jul 2015 - 03 Apr 2020 |
Individual | Green, Catherine Maree |
Rd 2 Dairy Flat 0792 New Zealand |
18 Dec 2019 - 03 Apr 2020 |
Director | Robert William Carter |
Tauriko Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
17 Oct 2011 - 21 Sep 2012 |
Individual | Narev, Robert |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
31 Aug 2007 - 21 Sep 2012 |
Individual | Darlow, Christopher Robert |
Torbay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
29 Jul 2015 - 03 Apr 2020 |
Director | John James Gosney |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
21 Sep 2012 - 29 Jul 2015 |
Director | Maryanne Green |
Stanmore Bay Whangaparaoa 0932 New Zealand |
29 Jul 2015 - 22 Jun 2017 |
Individual | Green, Maryanne |
Stanmore Bay Whangaparaoa 0932 New Zealand |
31 Aug 2007 - 21 Mar 2012 |
Ultimate Holding Company
David Harding Randell - Director
Appointment date: 27 Jul 2015
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2024
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Jul 2015
John Speer Wilson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Mar 2018
Termination date: 28 Jan 2019
Address: Rd 5, Te Awamutu, 3875 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Mar 2018
Christopher Robert Darlow - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Jul 2015
Termination date: 05 Apr 2018
Address: Torbay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Jul 2015
Maryanne Green - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Jul 2015
Termination date: 31 Dec 2015
Address: Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Jul 2015
Frances Kathleen Green - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Dec 2011
Termination date: 02 Jul 2015
Address: Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jan 2015
John Patrick Green - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Dec 2011
Termination date: 02 Jul 2015
Address: Rd 2, Papakura, 2582 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Dec 2011
Michael John Fisher - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Jul 2012
Termination date: 02 Jul 2015
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Oct 2013
John James Gosney - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Sep 2012
Termination date: 02 Jul 2015
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Sep 2012
Robert William Carter - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Aug 2007
Termination date: 20 Sep 2012
Address: Tauriko, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Aug 2007
Robert Narev - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Dec 2011
Termination date: 20 Sep 2012
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Mar 2012
Hugh Green - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Aug 2007
Termination date: 13 Jul 2012
Address: Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Oct 2009
Maryanne Green - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Aug 2007
Termination date: 19 Apr 2012
Address: Stanmore Bay, Auckland, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Aug 2007
Weiti Green Limited
Level 2
Hugh Green Charitable Trust Limited
Level 2
St Michaels Farm Limited
Level 2
Castlederg Limited
Level 2
Emerald Downs Limited
Level 2
Livestock Mart Auctions Limited
Level 2