Eastwave Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 10 Sep 2007. 9429033141831 is the number it was issued. "Commercial property lease/development" (ANZSIC L671210) is how the company has been categorised. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Tong-Wook Shinn - an active director whose contract began on 10 Sep 2007,
Sung Eun Bae - an inactive director whose contract began on 16 Feb 2010 and was terminated on 24 May 2010.
Updated on 15 Sep 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 11 Coldstream Court, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 (category: registered, physical).
Eastwave Limited had been using 2 Pepperwood Place, Shirley, Christchurch as their registered address up until 09 Mar 2012.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 512 shares) - Shinn, Tong-Wook - located at 8041, Ilam, Christchurch.
Principal place of activity
11 Coldstream Court, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 2 Pepperwood Place, Shirley, Christchurch, 8061 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 Sep 2010 to 09 Mar 2012
Address: 178a Condell Avenue, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 21 Apr 2009 to 02 Sep 2010
Address: 1219/135 Hobson Street, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 20 Mar 2008 to 21 Apr 2009
Address: 6m/154 The Terrace, Wellington 6011
Physical & registered address used from 10 Sep 2007 to 20 Mar 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 512
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 19 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 512 | |||
Individual | Shinn, Tong-wook |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
10 Sep 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Bae, Sung Eun |
Christchurch |
08 Feb 2010 - 16 Feb 2010 |
Tong-wook Shinn - Director
Appointment date: 10 Sep 2007
Address: Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2012
Sung Eun Bae - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Feb 2010
Termination date: 24 May 2010
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 16 Feb 2010
Huia Finance Limited
10 Coldstream Court
Scenic Hotels (auckland) Limited
10 Coldstream Court
Affinity Fitness Limited
10 Coldstream Court
Scenic Hotels (international) Limited
10 Coldstream Court
Mlc Scenic Limited
10 Coldstream Court
Resort 2012 Limited
10 Coldstream Court
Alamidas Investments Limited
270 Waimairi Road
Firth Properties Limited
46a Totara Street
Holding 1 Limited
8 Memorial Avenue
Mime Properties Limited
123 Puriri Street
Site Mate New Zealand Limited
114 Memorial Avenue
The People Hub Limited
2 Matisse Place