Wine By Design Limited, a registered company, was started on 21 Sep 2007. 9429033134451 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. This company has been run by 2 directors: Matthew Alfred Farrah - an active director whose contract began on 21 Sep 2007,
Anthony Louis Moore - an inactive director whose contract began on 21 Sep 2007 and was terminated on 29 Jun 2009.
Updated on 21 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Suite 1, 126 Trafalgar Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 (types include: registered, physical).
Wine By Design Limited had been using 202 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland as their registered address up to 16 May 2013.
All shares (100 shares exactly) are in the hands of a single group consisting of 2 entities, namely:
Fletcher Vautier Moore Trustees Limited (an entity) located at 105 Collingwood Street, Nelson postcode 7010,
Farrah, Matthew Alfred (an individual) located at Griffith, Act postcode 2603.
Previous addresses
Address: 202 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Nov 2010 to 16 May 2013
Address: C/-johnston Associates, 202 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 Apr 2008 to 11 Nov 2010
Address: 202 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland
Registered address used from 20 Mar 2008 to 02 Apr 2008
Address: West Yates Chartered Accountant, 72 Trafalgar Street, Nelson
Physical address used from 21 Sep 2007 to 02 Apr 2008
Address: West Yates Chartered Accountant, 72 Trafalgar Street, Nelson
Registered address used from 21 Sep 2007 to 20 Mar 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 06 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Fletcher Vautier Moore Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035766735 |
105 Collingwood Street Nelson 7010 New Zealand |
21 Sep 2007 - |
Individual | Farrah, Matthew Alfred |
Griffith Act 2603 Australia |
21 Sep 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Moore, Anthony Louis |
309 Rapaura Road Renwick |
21 Sep 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Matthew Alfred Farrah - Director
Appointment date: 21 Sep 2007
ASIC Name: Margin Brothers Pty Limited
Address: Griffith, Act, 2603 Australia
Address used since 25 Aug 2020
Address: Kingston, Act, 2604 Australia
Address: Red Hill, Canberra, Act, 2603 Australia
Address used since 14 May 2015
Address: Kingston, Act, 2604 Australia
Anthony Louis Moore - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Sep 2007
Termination date: 29 Jun 2009
Address: Renwick, 7273 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Sep 2007
Burgess & Sons Limited
Suite 1, 126 Trafalgar Street
Gumleaf Farming Limited
Suite 1, 126 Trafalgar Street
Vent Limited
Suite 1, 126 Trafalgar Street
Finewood Creations Limited
Suite 1, 126 Trafalgar Street
Halliday Family Trustees Limited
Suite 1, 126 Trafalgar Street
Tasman No4 Trustees Limited
Suite 1, 126 Trafalgar Street