View Downs Limited, a registered company, was started on 31 Oct 2007. 9429033111346 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. This company has been supervised by 3 directors: Robert Ernest Frank Sloss - an active director whose contract began on 31 Oct 2007,
Kurt Sloss - an active director whose contract began on 31 Oct 2007,
Alison Mary Sloss - an active director whose contract began on 31 Oct 2007.
Updated on 22 Jul 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 4 Tavern Place, Greta Valley, 7387 (type: registered, physical).
View Downs Limited had been using Stone Daly Limited, Chartered Accountants, 4 Tavern Place, Greta Valley 7387 as their registered address until 20 Apr 2011.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (4 groups). The first group consists of 97 shares (97 per cent) held by 2 entities. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1 per cent). Finally the third share allotment (1 share 1 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address: Stone Daly Limited, Chartered Accountants, 4 Tavern Place, Greta Valley 7387 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 May 2009 to 20 Apr 2011
Address: Stone Daly Marr Limited, Chartered Accountants, 4 Tavern Place, Greta Valley 7387
Registered & physical address used from 05 May 2008 to 06 May 2009
Address: C/-stone Daly Marr Limited, Greta Valley, Amberley R D
Registered & physical address used from 31 Oct 2007 to 05 May 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 29 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 97 | |||
Individual | Sloss, Robert Ernest Frank |
Rd 3 Greta Valley 7483 New Zealand |
31 Oct 2007 - |
Individual | Sloss, Alison Mary |
Rd 3 Greta Valley 7483 New Zealand |
31 Oct 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Sloss, Robert Ernest Frank |
Rd 3 Greta Valley 7483 New Zealand |
31 Oct 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Sloss, Alison Mary |
Rd 3 Greta Valley 7483 New Zealand |
31 Oct 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Sloss, Kurt |
Rd 3 Waipara 7483 New Zealand |
31 Oct 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Daly, Mark Frances |
Rd 1 Greta Valley 7387 New Zealand |
31 Oct 2007 - 19 Apr 2022 |
Robert Ernest Frank Sloss - Director
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2007
Address: Rd 3, Amberley, 7483 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Apr 2015
Kurt Sloss - Director
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2007
Address: Rd 3, Amberley, 7483 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Apr 2015
Alison Mary Sloss - Director
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2007
Address: Rd 3, Amberley, 7483 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Apr 2015
Latitude 42 Limited
4 Tavern Place
Waikari Health Care Limited
4 Tavern Drive
Cheviot Community Health Centre (2013) Limited
4 Tavern Drive
Medbury Irrigation Limited
4 Tavern Place
T & J Penney Limited
4 Tavern Place
Glassonberry Limited
4 Tavern Place