B C Russell Property Limited was registered on 12 Oct 2007 and issued an NZ business number of 9429033090627. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Bridget Coral Russell - an active director whose contract began on 12 Oct 2007,
Geoffrey Mirkin - an inactive director whose contract began on 12 Oct 2007 and was terminated on 27 Mar 2009.
As stated in BizDb's database (last updated on 10 Sep 2024), this company registered 1 address: 16 Edinburgh Street, Rd6, Invercargill, 9876 (type: registered, physical).
Until 16 Nov 2022, B C Russell Property Limited had been using 51 Mcivor Road, Rd6, Invercargill as their registered address.
BizDb identified more names used by this company: from 03 Feb 2010 to 06 Nov 2012 they were called Cocobella Otago Limited, from 12 Oct 2007 to 03 Feb 2010 they were called Joanna G Otago Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Russell, Bridget Coral (an individual) located at Roxburgh, Roxburgh postcode 9500. B C Russell Property Limited has been categorised as "Business administrative service" (business classification N729110).
Previous addresses
Address: 51 Mcivor Road, Rd6, Invercargill, 9876 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 Dec 2020 to 16 Nov 2022
Address: 17 Durham Street, Tapanui, Tapanui, 9522 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 20 Nov 2017 to 08 Dec 2020
Address: 1530 Moa Flat Road, Rd 2, Tapanui, 9587 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 11 Nov 2015 to 20 Nov 2017
Address: 69c Newcastle Street, Riversdale, 9744 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 27 Jan 2014 to 11 Nov 2015
Address: Harvie Green Wyatt, Chartered Accountants, Level 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin 9016 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 03 Nov 2008 to 27 Jan 2014
Address: Harvie Green Wyatt, Chartered Accountants, Level 5,229 Moray Place, Dunedin
Physical & registered address used from 24 Oct 2007 to 03 Nov 2008
Address: Harvie Green Wyatt, Health Board House, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin
Registered & physical address used from 12 Oct 2007 to 24 Oct 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 18 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Russell, Bridget Coral |
Roxburgh Roxburgh 9500 New Zealand |
12 Oct 2007 - |
Bridget Coral Russell - Director
Appointment date: 12 Oct 2007
Address: Roxburgh, Roxburgh, 9500 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Nov 2022
Address: Rd6, Invercargill, 9876 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2020
Address: Tapanui, Tapanui, 9522 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Nov 2017
Address: Rd 2, Tapanui, 9587 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2015
Geoffrey Mirkin - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Oct 2007
Termination date: 27 Mar 2009
Address: Roslyn, Dunedin 9010,
Address used since 16 Oct 2007
The West Otago Theatrical Society Incorporated
C/o B.hanna
South Otago Motor Cycle Club Incorporated
11 York Lane Po Box 208
West Otago Rsa Club Incorporated
51 Northumberland Street
South West Autos 2010 Limited
State Highway 90
West Otago Swimming Pool Management Board Incorporated
C/o Clutha District Council
Farm Refunds Limited
41 Northumberland Street
Calder Stewart Shared Services Limited
6 Shakespeare Street
Hinano Trustees Limited
Level 3, 329 Durham St North
Livestock Supplies Nz Trustees Limited
15a Hokonui Drive
Tight Lines Consulting Limited
17 Lewin Street
Tulloch Motorsport Limited
15a Hokonui Drive
Yamaguchi Consulting Limited
15 Mersey Street