Rotowhero Forest (2007) Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 06 Nov 2007. 9429033060552 is the business number it was issued. "Forestry ownership or management (excluding field operations)" (business classification M696235) is how the company is categorised. The company has been run by 2 directors: Francis Robert Twiss - an active director whose contract began on 06 Nov 2007,
Logan Donald Balderston - an active director whose contract began on 15 Aug 2011.
Last updated on 30 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 4 addresses this company uses, namely: an address for records at 248 Broadway, Marton, Marton, 4710 (other address),
248 Broadway, Marton, Marton, 4710 (records address),
248 Broadway, Marton, 4710 (registered address),
248 Broadway, Marton, 4710 (physical address) among others.
Rotowhero Forest (2007) Limited had been using 13 Follett Street, Marton as their physical address up to 14 Nov 2016.
A total of 1900 shares are allocated to 12 shareholders (6 groups). The first group consists of 311 shares (16.37 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 476 shares (25.05 per cent). Lastly there is the 3rd share allocation (76 shares 4 per cent) made up of 2 entities.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 248 Broadway, Marton, Marton, 4710 New Zealand
Other (Address for Records) & records address (Address for Records) used from 03 Oct 2022
Previous address
Address #1: 13 Follett Street, Marton New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 06 Nov 2007 to 14 Nov 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1900
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 05 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 311 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Green Glory Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038181849 |
Marton Marton 4710 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 476 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Ausskok Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039657985 |
Palmerston North New Zealand |
05 Feb 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 76 | |||
Director | Balderston, Logan Donald |
Flat 2, 4 Maclaurin Street, Auckland 0600 New Zealand |
08 Dec 2011 - |
Individual | Twiss, Francis Robert |
Marton 4710 New Zealand |
06 Nov 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 293 | |||
Individual | Twiss, Francis Robert |
Marton 4710 New Zealand |
06 Nov 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 311 | |||
Individual | Thompson, Jennifer Anne |
Fitzherbert Palmerston North 4410 New Zealand |
05 Feb 2015 - |
Individual | Sinclair, Mark Conway |
Palmerston North Palmerston North 4410 New Zealand |
05 Feb 2015 - |
Individual | Thompson, John Stuart |
Fitzherbert Palmerston North 4410 New Zealand |
05 Feb 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #6 Number of Shares: 433 | |||
Individual | Simpson, Peter Charles |
Rd 10 Ashhurst 4470 New Zealand |
03 Jan 2018 - |
Individual | Simpson, Kelsey Anne |
Rd 10 Ashhurst 4470 New Zealand |
03 Jan 2018 - |
Individual | Simpson, Shane Illya |
Rd 10 Ashhurst 4470 New Zealand |
03 Jan 2018 - |
Individual | Szuldak, Sylvia Anna |
Rd 10 Ashhurst 4470 New Zealand |
03 Jan 2018 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Campbell, Douglas |
Nelson Nelson 7010 New Zealand |
20 Mar 2015 - 18 Jul 2018 |
Individual | Thompson, John Stuart |
Highbury Palmerston North 4412 New Zealand |
23 Feb 2009 - 03 Jan 2018 |
Individual | Ayres, Warwick Richard |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
12 Nov 2009 - 03 Oct 2022 |
Individual | Thompson, Jacqueline Frances |
Awapuni Palmerston North 4412 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2007 - 25 Jan 2018 |
Individual | Fell, Allan Royals |
71 Symonds Street Auckland 1150 New Zealand |
23 Jan 2014 - 03 Oct 2022 |
Individual | Allen, William Henry |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2007 - 18 Jul 2018 |
Individual | Campbell, Douglas |
Nelson Nelson 7010 New Zealand |
20 Mar 2015 - 18 Jul 2018 |
Entity | Pakihikura Forest (2007) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033060415 Company Number: 2036816 |
Marton Marton 4710 New Zealand |
18 Jul 2011 - 02 May 2018 |
Individual | Allen, Rosemary Anne Forbes |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2007 - 18 Jul 2018 |
Individual | Thompson, Peter |
Awapuni Palmerston North 4412 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2007 - 25 Jan 2018 |
Individual | Thompson, John |
Highbury Palmerston North 4412 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2007 - 20 Mar 2015 |
Individual | O'connell, Peter John |
Highfield Timaru 7910 New Zealand |
12 Nov 2009 - 23 Jan 2014 |
Individual | Callesen, Alexandra Elizabeth |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
12 Nov 2009 - 23 Jan 2014 |
Individual | Calleson, Thomas Frederick |
Tallangatta Victoria 3700 Australia |
27 Nov 2007 - 08 Dec 2011 |
Individual | Gaffikin, Richard Alexander Bruce |
Fendalton Christchurch |
27 Nov 2007 - 27 Nov 2007 |
Individual | Callesen, Patrick Joseph |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
12 Nov 2009 - 23 Jan 2014 |
Individual | Cameron, Alister Ross |
Marton Marton 4710 New Zealand |
25 Jan 2018 - 31 Mar 2022 |
Individual | Cameron, Alister Ross |
Marton Marton 4710 New Zealand |
25 Jan 2018 - 31 Mar 2022 |
Individual | Fell, Allan |
88 Shortland Street Auckland |
27 Nov 2007 - 23 Feb 2009 |
Entity | Pakihikura Forest (2007) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033060415 Company Number: 2036816 |
Marton Marton 4710 New Zealand |
18 Jul 2011 - 02 May 2018 |
Individual | Allen, Rosemary Anne Forbes |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2007 - 18 Jul 2018 |
Individual | Esposito, Kathryn |
Christchurch New Zealand |
27 Nov 2007 - 18 Jul 2011 |
Individual | Allen, William Henry |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2007 - 18 Jul 2018 |
Individual | Gaffikin, Ivana |
Riccarton Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2007 - 03 Jan 2018 |
Individual | Willis, Rodney George |
88 Shortland Street Auckland |
27 Nov 2007 - 23 Feb 2009 |
Individual | Esposito, Michael |
Christchurch New Zealand |
27 Nov 2007 - 18 Jul 2011 |
Francis Robert Twiss - Director
Appointment date: 06 Nov 2007
Address: Marton, Marton, 4710 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2015
Logan Donald Balderston - Director
Appointment date: 15 Aug 2011
Address: Blockhouse Bay, Auckland, 0600 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Aug 2011
The Boutique Real Estate Company Limited
248 Broadway
Henderson Holdings (marton) Limited
248 Broadway
Pakihikura Forest Limited
248 Broadway
Knopf Contracting Limited
248 Broadway
Pakihikura Forest (2007) Limited
248 Broadway
Santoft Estates Limited
248 Broadway
Foxton Forestry Limited
16 Bell Street
Kakariki Adventures Limited
117 Green Road
Pakihikura Forest Limited
248 Broadway
Rangitoto Farm Co Limited
Chartered Accountants
Santoft Forests Limited
248 Broadway
W.r.l. Forest Limited
16 Bell Street