Asia Power Limited, a registered company, was started on 29 Jan 2008. 9429032984552 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. This company has been run by 4 directors: Andrew Kin Hang Wong - an active director whose contract started on 29 Jan 2008,
Wai Yee Yan - an active director whose contract started on 01 Nov 2008,
Ken Chee Keong Yan - an inactive director whose contract started on 29 Jan 2008 and was terminated on 01 Jun 2024,
Terry Chong Lean Lee - an inactive director whose contract started on 29 Jan 2008 and was terminated on 01 Nov 2008.
Updated on 17 Sep 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 33 Stratford Road, Manurewa, Auckland, 2105 (types include: postal, office).
Asia Power Limited had been using 8/130 Stancombe Road, Flat Bush, Auckland as their registered address up to 08 Aug 2011.
A total of 50000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 25000 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 25000 shares (50%).
Principal place of activity
33 Stratford Road, Manurewa, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 8/130 Stancombe Road, Flat Bush, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 29 Jan 2008 to 08 Aug 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 50000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 02 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 25000 | |||
Individual | Yan, Wai Yee |
Manurewa Auckland 2105 New Zealand |
02 Nov 2008 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 25000 | |||
Individual | Wong, Andrew Kin Hang |
Manurewa Auckland 2105 New Zealand |
29 Jan 2008 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Yan, Ken Chee Keong |
Mt Albert Auckland New Zealand |
29 Jan 2008 - 02 Jul 2024 |
Individual | Lee, Terry Chong Lean |
Flat Bush Auckland |
29 Jan 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Andrew Kin Hang Wong - Director
Appointment date: 29 Jan 2008
Address: Manurewa, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2011
Wai Yee Yan - Director
Appointment date: 01 Nov 2008
Address: Manurewa, Auckland, 2105 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2011
Ken Chee Keong Yan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jan 2008
Termination date: 01 Jun 2024
Address: Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2011
Terry Chong Lean Lee - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jan 2008
Termination date: 01 Nov 2008
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland,
Address used since 29 Jan 2008
Scrumptious Cakes By Design Limited
19 Menen Place
Weed Store Limited
25 Rathmar Drive
Indo Kiwi Sports & Cultural Club Incorporated
27 Rathmar Drive
St Joseph Trustee Holdings Limited
17 Nakhle Place
Golden Petal Investments Limited
25 Amarillo Place
Homoeopathy Nz Limited
28 Stratford Road