Bromfield Holdings Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 18 Feb 2008. 9429032924732 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Neil David Bromfield - an active director whose contract began on 18 Feb 2008,
Joanne Patricia Bromfield - an inactive director whose contract began on 18 Feb 2008 and was terminated on 22 Oct 2012.
Last updated on 31 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 79B Blighs Road, Strowan, Christchurch, 8052 (category: registered, physical).
Bromfield Holdings Limited had been using Taurus Group Ltd, Level 1, 22 Foster Street,, Tower Junction, Christchurch as their physical address up until 27 Jul 2015.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 99 shares (99 per cent) held by 2 entities. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address #1: Taurus Group Ltd, Level 1, 22 Foster Street,, Tower Junction, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 23 Jun 2011 to 27 Jul 2015
Address #2: Taurus Group Ltd, Level 3, Urs House, 287 Durham Street, Christchurch 8011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 22 Sep 2009 to 23 Jun 2011
Address #3: 21 Weston Way, Lincoln, Christchurch
Physical & registered address used from 18 Feb 2008 to 22 Sep 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 05 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | Bromfield, Neil David |
Strowan Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
18 Feb 2008 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Cambridge Trustees No.2 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034869550 |
Christchurch Central 8041 New Zealand |
11 Mar 2020 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Bromfield, Neil David |
Strowan Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
18 Feb 2008 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Ql Corporate Trustee Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034801307 Company Number: 1627250 |
18 Feb 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Ql Corporate Investment Trusts Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033587639 Company Number: 1912219 |
271 St Heliers Bay Road St Heliers, Auckland |
20 Feb 2008 - 11 Mar 2020 |
Individual | Bromfield, Joanne Patricia |
Lincoln Christchurch |
18 Feb 2008 - 16 May 2013 |
Entity | Ql Corporate Trustee Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034801307 Company Number: 1627250 |
18 Feb 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Ql Corporate Investment Trusts Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033587639 Company Number: 1912219 |
271 St Heliers Bay Road St Heliers, Auckland |
20 Feb 2008 - 11 Mar 2020 |
Neil David Bromfield - Director
Appointment date: 18 Feb 2008
Address: Strowan, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jul 2015
Joanne Patricia Bromfield - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Feb 2008
Termination date: 22 Oct 2012
Address: Lincoln, Christchurch, 7608 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Feb 2008
Concrete Extensions Limited
12 Condell Avenue
Bhavem Investments Limited
8 Bounty Street
Dress The Nest Limited
4 Bounty Street
Edge Deck South Island Limited
4 Bounty Street
Tour South Limited
4 Bounty Street
Christchurch Real Estate Limited
4 Bounty Street