Bellingham Properties Limited, a registered company, was registered on 08 Feb 2008. 9429032917888 is the business number it was issued. "Manufacturing nec" (ANZSIC C259907) is how the company has been classified. The company has been managed by 3 directors: Graeme John Bellingham - an active director whose contract began on 08 Feb 2008,
Marilyn Gay Bellingham - an active director whose contract began on 08 Feb 2008,
George Robert Bellingham - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 Feb 2008 and was terminated on 10 Jun 2013.
Updated on 22 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 14 Suncrest Drive, West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 (types include: postal, office).
Bellingham Properties Limited had been using C/-Hayes Knight, Chartered Accountants, 470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland as their registered address up until 18 Mar 2013.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Principal place of activity
14 Suncrest Drive, West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: C/-hayes Knight, Chartered Accountants, 470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 27 Jun 2012 to 18 Mar 2013
Address #2: C/-hayes Knight Nz Ltd, Chartered Accountants, 5 William Laurie Place, Albany, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 24 Apr 2008 to 27 Jun 2012
Address #3: C/-hayes Knight, Chartered Accountants, 1/100 Bush Road, Albany, North Shore City 0751
Physical & registered address used from 08 Feb 2008 to 24 Apr 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 13 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Bellingham, Graeme John |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 New Zealand |
08 Feb 2008 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Bellingham, Marilyn Gay |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 New Zealand |
08 Feb 2008 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Bellingham, George Robert |
Massey Auckland 0614 New Zealand |
08 Feb 2008 - 03 Jul 2013 |
Graeme John Bellingham - Director
Appointment date: 08 Feb 2008
Address: West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jun 2019
Address: Royal Heights, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Sep 2015
Marilyn Gay Bellingham - Director
Appointment date: 08 Feb 2008
Address: West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jun 2019
Address: Royal Heights, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Sep 2015
George Robert Bellingham - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Feb 2008
Termination date: 10 Jun 2013
Address: Massey, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Jun 2012
Farrah Breads Limited
470 Parnell Road
Weston Mcdonald Trustee Limited
470 Parnell Road
The House Company Limited
470 Parnell Road
Takutai Trustee Limited
470 Parnell Road
Hicks Family Trustees Limited
470 Parnell Road
Leo Peng Trustee Limited
470 Parnell Road
Alba Industries Anz Limited
C/-david Nicoll, Solicitor
Colonial Hot Tub Co. Limited
C/o Hwi Ltd, Level 3, 139 Carlton Gore
Covermaker Limited
48 Broadway
First Manufacturing Limited
470 Parnell Road
Haus Technologies Limited
Flat 1, 15 Birdwood Crescent
Health Pak Limited
Parnell House