Chain On Consultants Limited, a registered company, was launched on 07 Mar 2008. 9429032906738 is the NZBN it was issued. "Management services nec" (ANZSIC M696297) is how the company is categorised. This company has been supervised by 6 directors: Coral Kuang - an active director whose contract began on 06 Sep 2018,
Raymond Tak Wai Fung - an inactive director whose contract began on 22 Jun 2018 and was terminated on 18 Sep 2018,
Coral Kuang - an inactive director whose contract began on 07 Mar 2008 and was terminated on 04 Jul 2018,
Raymond Fung - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Apr 2010 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2013,
Ivy Nicholson - an inactive director whose contract began on 07 Mar 2008 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2010.
Updated on 23 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 293A Church Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 (type: registered, physical).
Chain On Consultants Limited had been using Level 9,43 High Street, Auckland as their physical address until 04 Oct 2017.
Past names for the company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 07 Mar 2008 to 10 Mar 2008 they were called Chain On 2008 Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 98 shares (98 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 2 shares (2 per cent).
Principal place of activity
293a Church Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: Level 9,43 High Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 Jun 2011 to 04 Oct 2017
Address: Level 9, 3-13 Shortland Street, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Apr 2010 to 09 Jun 2011
Address: Level 4, Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland, C/-gilligan Sheppard Limited
Registered & physical address used from 07 Mar 2008 to 12 Apr 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 28 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | C&r Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033647104 |
Ellerslie Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
01 Apr 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 2 | |||
Individual | Kuang, Coral |
Ellerslie Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
12 Sep 2018 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Fung, Raymond |
Albany Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
01 Apr 2010 - 04 Apr 2013 |
Individual | Kuang, Coral |
Albany Auckland |
20 Aug 2008 - 20 Aug 2008 |
Individual | Kuang, Coral |
Albany Heights Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
01 Apr 2010 - 22 Jun 2018 |
Other | C&r Trustee Limited | 07 Mar 2008 - 20 Aug 2008 | |
Entity | Nicholson Family Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033610634 Company Number: 1908682 |
07 Mar 2008 - 20 Aug 2008 | |
Individual | Fung, Raymond Tak Wai |
Albany Heights Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
22 Jun 2018 - 12 Sep 2018 |
Other | Null - C&r Trustee Limited | 07 Mar 2008 - 20 Aug 2008 | |
Individual | Nicholson, Ivy |
Albany Auckland |
20 Aug 2008 - 20 Aug 2008 |
Entity | Nicholson Family Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033610634 Company Number: 1908682 |
07 Mar 2008 - 20 Aug 2008 |
Coral Kuang - Director
Appointment date: 06 Sep 2018
Address: Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Dec 2023
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Sep 2018
Raymond Tak Wai Fung - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Jun 2018
Termination date: 18 Sep 2018
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Jun 2018
Coral Kuang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Mar 2008
Termination date: 04 Jul 2018
Address: Albany Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Sep 2016
Raymond Fung - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2010
Termination date: 01 Apr 2013
Address: Albany, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Apr 2010
Ivy Nicholson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Mar 2008
Termination date: 01 Apr 2010
Address: Albany, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Mar 2008
Paul Nicholson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Jul 2008
Termination date: 01 Apr 2010
Address: Albany, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Jul 2008
152 Hereford Limited
151 Cambridge Terrace
2re Limited
12a Jack Conway Avenue
3gm Limited
1100b Whangaparaoa Road
5million Flying Kiwis Limited
23a Kauri Street
Abbott Business Architects Limited
1227 Ararimu Road
Abc Testing Services Nz Limited
27a Izard Road