Ogeejan Investments Limited, a registered company, was started on 22 May 2008. 9429032743135 is the number it was issued. "Investment - commercial property" (ANZSIC L671230) is how the company has been classified. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Janet Frances Evans - an active director whose contract began on 22 May 2008,
Owen Godfrey Evans - an active director whose contract began on 22 May 2008.
Updated on 30 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 4 John Campbell Crescent, Hillmorton, Christchurch, 8024 (type: registered, physical).
Ogeejan Investments Limited had been using 46 Acheron Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch as their registered address until 16 Apr 2021.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Principal place of activity
4 John Campbell Crescent, Hillmorton, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 46 Acheron Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Jan 2019 to 16 Apr 2021
Address #2: 46 Acheron Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Registered address used from 04 Aug 2016 to 21 Jan 2019
Address #3: 76 Thackeray Street, Waltham, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Registered address used from 09 Jul 2015 to 04 Aug 2016
Address #4: 76 Thackeray Street, Waltham, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Sep 2013 to 09 Jul 2015
Address #5: Unit 12, Newpark, 14 Broad Street, Woolston, Chrisrchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Aug 2011 to 26 Sep 2013
Address #6: Level 4, Insignis House, 192 Cashel Street, Christchurch 8011. New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 22 May 2008 to 04 Aug 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 09 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Evans, Janet Frances |
Hillmorton Christchurch 8024 New Zealand |
22 May 2008 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Evans, Owen Godfrey |
Hillmorton Christchurch 8024 New Zealand |
22 May 2008 - |
Janet Frances Evans - Director
Appointment date: 22 May 2008
Address: Hillmorton, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2014
Owen Godfrey Evans - Director
Appointment date: 22 May 2008
Address: Hillmorton, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2014
Waitikiri Golf Pro Limited
46 Acheron Drive
Ambience Tiling Limited
46 Acheron Drive
Triton Buildworks Limited
46 Acheron Drive
Elevator & Electrical Services Limited
46 Acheron Drive
Dna Steel Construction Limited
46 Acheron Drive
D Frost Refrigeration And Air Conditioning Limited
46 Acheron Drive
Juliette & Co. 2013 Limited
48 Colligan Street
Sarawak Investment Group Limited
5-243 Blenheim Road,
Skene Proprietary Limited
46 Acheron Drive
Sockspacific Holdings Limited
Unit 7, 295 Blenheim Road
The Jam Can Limited
46 Acheron Drive
Wet Fish Investments Limited
Unit 1, 243 Blenheim Road