Sanford Fish Market Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 26 Aug 2008. 9429032603873 is the number it was issued. This company has been managed by 7 directors: Paul John Alston - an active director whose contract started on 24 Dec 2021,
Dean Campbell Mcintosh - an inactive director whose contract started on 30 Apr 2014 and was terminated on 26 Apr 2022,
Clement Jit Hui Chia - an inactive director whose contract started on 29 Oct 2015 and was terminated on 24 Dec 2021,
Shane Lawrence Walsh - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 Aug 2008 and was terminated on 30 Oct 2015,
Eric Francis Barratt - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 Aug 2008 and was terminated on 23 Dec 2013.
Sanford Fish Market Limited had been using 22 Jellicoe Street, Auckland 1010 as their registered address up until 06 Apr 2009.
Old names used by the company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 26 Aug 2008 to 17 Oct 2014 they were named The Big Picture Auckland Limited.
Previous address
Address: 22 Jellicoe Street, Auckland 1010
Registered & physical address used from 26 Aug 2008 to 06 Apr 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 05 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Sanford Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429000010856 |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1010 |
26 Aug 2008 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | The Big Picture Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036490134 Company Number: 1211530 |
26 Aug 2008 - 05 Apr 2012 | |
Entity | The Big Picture Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036490134 Company Number: 1211530 |
26 Aug 2008 - 05 Apr 2012 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Paul John Alston - Director
Appointment date: 24 Dec 2021
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Dec 2021
Dean Campbell Mcintosh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Apr 2014
Termination date: 26 Apr 2022
Address: Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Apr 2014
Clement Jit Hui Chia - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Oct 2015
Termination date: 24 Dec 2021
Address: Schnapper Rock, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Oct 2015
Shane Lawrence Walsh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Aug 2008
Termination date: 30 Oct 2015
Address: Freemans Bay, Auckland 1011, New Zealand
Address used since 26 Aug 2008
Eric Francis Barratt - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Aug 2008
Termination date: 23 Dec 2013
Address: 20 Market Place, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2010
Catherine Margaret Parker - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Aug 2008
Termination date: 02 Apr 2012
Address: Cromwell 9384,
Address used since 30 Mar 2010
Phillip Anthony Parker - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Aug 2008
Termination date: 12 Mar 2012
Address: Cromwell 9384,
Address used since 30 Mar 2010
Sanford Limited
22 Jellicoe Street
Seafood Paradise Limited
22 Jellicoe Street
Marine Services Development Limited
22 Jellicoe Street
Auckland Seafood Festival Limited
22 Jellicoe Street
The Northern Fisheries Management Stakeholder Company Limited
1st Floor
Auckland Fish Market Limited
22 Jellicoe Street