G E & L O Nicholl Trustees Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 16 Feb 2009. 9429032385731 is the business number it was issued. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is how the company has been classified. This company has been managed by 7 directors: Patrick Gregory Costelloe - an active director whose contract began on 16 Feb 2009,
Chantal Morkel - an active director whose contract began on 20 Jan 2023,
Simon Leonard Price - an active director whose contract began on 20 Jan 2023,
Dominic Inglis William Fitchett - an active director whose contract began on 20 Jan 2023,
Philippa Reeves Allan - an active director whose contract began on 01 Feb 2024.
Updated on 13 Sep 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 1, The Regent, 33 Cathedral Square, Christchurch, 8011 (types include: registered, service).
G E & L O Nicholl Trustees Limited had been using 518 Colombo Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch as their registered address up until 13 May 2014.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 10 shares) - M & C Shareholders Limited - located at 8011, 33 Cathedral Square, Christchurch.
Principal place of activity
Level 2, 14 Dundas Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 518 Colombo Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 22 Apr 2013 to 13 May 2014
Address #2: 355 Riccarton Road, Upper Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Apr 2012 to 22 Apr 2013
Address #3: Malley & Co Lawyers, Level 10, 47 Cathedral Square, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Feb 2009 to 05 Apr 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 05 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | M & C Shareholders Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049805277 |
33 Cathedral Square Christchurch 8011 New Zealand |
01 Feb 2022 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Price, Simon Leonard |
Redcliffs Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
28 Feb 2020 - 01 Feb 2022 |
Individual | Costelloe, Patrick Gregory |
Riccarton Christchurch 8011 New Zealand |
16 Feb 2009 - 01 Feb 2022 |
Individual | Costelloe, Patrick Gregory |
Riccarton Christchurch 8011 New Zealand |
16 Feb 2009 - 01 Feb 2022 |
Individual | Dravitzki, Dominic Peter |
Westmorland Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
09 Mar 2015 - 28 Feb 2020 |
Patrick Gregory Costelloe - Director
Appointment date: 16 Feb 2009
Address: Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Dec 2017
Address: Strowan, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Apr 2010
Chantal Morkel - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2023
Address: Redcliffs, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Apr 2023
Address: Hillmorton, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jan 2023
Simon Leonard Price - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2023
Address: Redcliffs, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jan 2023
Dominic Inglis William Fitchett - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2023
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jan 2023
Philippa Reeves Allan - Director
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2024
Address: St Albans, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2024
Gareth Falconer Abdinor - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2023
Termination date: 31 Jan 2023
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jan 2023
Dominic Peter Dravitzki - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 May 2014
Termination date: 09 Mar 2015
Address: Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Address used since 05 May 2014
Leighs Cockram Jv Limited
Level 2, 219 High Street
Reardon Holdings Limited
Level 2, 205 Durham Street South
Dravitzki Trustees Limited
Level 2, 14 Dundas Street
Delwyn Denton-lanauze Trustee Limited
Level 2, 14 Dundas Street
Manning Trustees Limited
Level 2, 14 Dundas Street
Ah Trust Co Limited
Level 2, 14 Dundas Street
C Green Trustee Limited
Level 1, 15b Leslie Hills Drive
Fox Trustee Limited
Level 1, 15b Leslie Hills Drive
S&k Molloy Trustees Limited
Level 1, 15b Leslie Hills Drive
T Green Trustee Limited
Level 1, 15b Leslie Hills Drive
Tavendale Trustees Limited
Level 1, 15b Leslie Hills Drive
Weir Nominees Limited
Level 1, 15b Leslie Hills Drive