Fenland Management Limited, a registered company, was launched on 17 Mar 2009. 9429032347562 is the business number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 5 directors: William Robert Donaldson - an active director whose contract began on 17 Mar 2009,
Glenn Nicholson Holmes - an active director whose contract began on 31 May 2021,
Aaron James Bunt - an active director whose contract began on 31 May 2021,
Philip William Gudopp - an inactive director whose contract began on 17 Mar 2009 and was terminated on 31 May 2021,
Mark Anthony Holland - an inactive director whose contract began on 17 Mar 2009 and was terminated on 31 May 2021.
Updated on 21 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 3, Building E, Union Square, 192 Anglesea Street, Hamilton, 3240 (category: registered, service).
Fenland Management Limited had been using Level 4, B N Z Building, 354 Victoria Street, Hamilton as their registered address until 24 Jul 2019.
A total of 9765539 shares are issued to 3 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 9273907 shares (94.97 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 2 shareholders in control of 491632 shares (5.03 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 4, B N Z Building, 354 Victoria Street, Hamilton, 3240 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Dec 2011 to 24 Jul 2019
Address #2: 5th Floor, N W M Building, Corner Victoria And London Street, Hamilton, 3240 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 Jun 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
Address #3: C/-staples Rodway Waikato Lp, Wel House, 5th Floor, Corner Victoria And London, Streets, Hamilton 3240 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Mar 2009 to 08 Jun 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 9765539
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 27 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 9273907 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Waibury Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048879170 |
192 Anglesea Street Hamilton 3204 New Zealand |
14 Jun 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 491632 | |||
Individual | Bunt, Tammy |
Rd 1 Culverden 7391 New Zealand |
29 Oct 2014 - |
Individual | Bunt, Aaron James |
Rd 1 Culverden 7391 New Zealand |
29 Oct 2014 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Holland, Mark Anthony |
Rd 1 Hamilton 3281 New Zealand |
03 Jun 2011 - 15 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Gudopp, Philip William |
Waikari 7491 New Zealand |
03 Jun 2011 - 15 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Holland, Mark Anthony |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 |
17 Mar 2009 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Other | Waibury Lp |
354 Victoria Street Hamilton 3204 New Zealand |
03 Jun 2011 - 15 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Gudopp, Jennith Jane |
Waikari 7491 New Zealand |
03 Jun 2011 - 15 Jun 2021 |
Entity | Fenland Group Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032779585 Company Number: 2122770 |
14 Apr 2009 - 03 Jun 2011 | |
Entity | Fenland Group Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032779585 Company Number: 2122770 |
14 Apr 2009 - 03 Jun 2011 |
William Robert Donaldson - Director
Appointment date: 17 Mar 2009
Address: Rd 1, Hamilton, 3281 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Dec 2015
Glenn Nicholson Holmes - Director
Appointment date: 31 May 2021
Address: Fairfield, Hamilton, 3214 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2021
Aaron James Bunt - Director
Appointment date: 31 May 2021
Address: Rd 1, Culverden, 7391 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2021
Philip William Gudopp - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Mar 2009
Termination date: 31 May 2021
Address: Waikari, 7491 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Mar 2021
Address: Rd 1, Culverden, 7391 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Mar 2009
Mark Anthony Holland - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Mar 2009
Termination date: 31 May 2021
Address: Rd 1, Hamilton, 3281 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Mar 2020
Address: Flagstaff, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Apr 2013
Address: St Andrews, Hamilton, 3200 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Sep 2019
Bzpay Trading Nz Limited
354 Victoria Street
Performance Panel & Paint 2013 Limited
Level 4, B N Z Building
Itn Limited
354 Victoria Street
Revolution Contracting Limited
Level 4, Bnz Building
Bzbank Limited
354 Victoria Street
Quikpay New Zealand Limited
Level 4, B N Z Building