Eastlight Asset Trading No. 1 Limited, a registered company, was launched on 23 Jul 2009. 9429032093292 is the number it was issued. This company has been run by 3 directors: Bradley Johannes Kooiman - an active director whose contract began on 05 Dec 2019,
Michael Edwin Kooiman - an inactive director whose contract began on 04 Sep 2013 and was terminated on 05 Dec 2019,
Walter Maxwell - an inactive director whose contract began on 23 Jul 2009 and was terminated on 04 Sep 2013.
Last updated on 20 Jul 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 19 Paterson Street, Mount Victoria, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, physical).
Eastlight Asset Trading No. 1 Limited had been using Unit 5, 408 Hutt Road, Alicetown, Lower Hutt as their registered address up to 10 Dec 2020.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 88 shares (88 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 10 shares (10 per cent). Lastly we have the third share allotment (2 shares 2 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address: Unit 5, 408 Hutt Road, Alicetown, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Jan 2017 to 10 Dec 2020
Address: Floor 7, 276 Lambton Quay, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 17 Sep 2012 to 26 Jan 2017
Address: C/-brandons, 32 The Terrace, Wellington New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 23 Jul 2009 to 17 Sep 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 01 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 88 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Maximus Trustee Company No 2 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034321164 |
Mount Victoria Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
13 Sep 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Maximus Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034333198 |
Mount Victoria Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
30 Oct 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 2 | |||
Individual | Kooiman, Michael Edwin |
Mount Victoria Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
30 Oct 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Blackguard Finance Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032854442 Company Number: 2108375 |
23 Jul 2009 - 13 Sep 2012 | |
Entity | Blackguard Finance Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032854442 Company Number: 2108375 |
23 Jul 2009 - 13 Sep 2012 |
Bradley Johannes Kooiman - Director
Appointment date: 05 Dec 2019
Address: Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Dec 2019
Michael Edwin Kooiman - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Sep 2013
Termination date: 05 Dec 2019
Address: Mount Victoria, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Sep 2013
Walter Maxwell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Jul 2009
Termination date: 04 Sep 2013
Address: Miramar, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jul 2009
Stone Rocket Limited
Unit 5, 408 Hutt Road
Ultra Car Groom Limited
11 Wakefield Street
Highflo Co Limited
403 Hutt Road
New Field Investments Limited
25 Bouverie Street
Lockyer Family Trustee Limited
25 Bouverie Street
New Zealand Trotters Trust
C/o Owens Global Logistics