Raki Paua Farms Limited, a registered company, was launched on 09 Dec 1964. 9429031934909 is the NZBN it was issued. This company has been run by 2 directors: Simon James Connolly - an active director whose contract began on 18 Jan 2016,
Kevin John Connolly - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 Dec 1964 and was terminated on 05 Feb 2016.
Last updated on 19 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 39 George Street, Timaru, 7910 (type: registered, physical).
Raki Paua Farms Limited had been using 39 George Street, Timaru as their registered address up to 25 Jul 2011.
A total of 26750 shares are issued to 4 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 3175 shares (11.87 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 2 shareholders in control of 23573 shares (88.12 per cent). Lastly there is the 3rd share allocation (1 share 0 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 39 George Street, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Registered address used from 16 Jul 2010 to 25 Jul 2011
Address #2: Hubbard Churcher & Co, 39 George Street, Timaru New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 Feb 2009 to 16 Jul 2010
Address #3: C/- Mcfarlane Hornsey Matthews, Cnr Stafford And Sefton Streets, Timaru
Registered address used from 04 Aug 1998 to 09 Feb 2009
Address #4: Cnr Stafford Street & Sefton Street, Timaru
Physical address used from 22 May 1997 to 09 Feb 2009
Address #5: C/o A A Q Solomon, Cannon St, Timaru
Registered address used from 28 Jan 1992 to 04 Aug 1998
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 26750
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 03 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 3175 | |||
Individual | Connolly, Simon James |
Rd 26 Temuka 7986 New Zealand |
09 Dec 1964 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 23573 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Hc Trustees 2009 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032451658 |
Timaru 7910 New Zealand |
30 Jul 2009 - |
Individual | Connolly, Simon James |
Rd 26 Temuka 7986 New Zealand |
09 Dec 1964 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Connolly, Shona Myfanway |
Rd 26 Temuka 7986 New Zealand |
09 Dec 1964 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Connolly, Kevin John |
R D 26 Temuka 7986 New Zealand |
09 Dec 1964 - 16 Jul 2004 |
Entity | Mhs Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036774456 Company Number: 1161579 |
22 Dec 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Individual | Connolly, Kevin John |
R D 26 Temuka |
09 Dec 1964 - 16 Jul 2004 |
Entity | Mhs Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036774456 Company Number: 1161579 |
22 Dec 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Simon James Connolly - Director
Appointment date: 18 Jan 2016
Address: Rd 26, Temuka, 7986 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Jan 2016
Kevin John Connolly - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Dec 1964
Termination date: 05 Feb 2016
Address: Rd 26, Temuka, 7986 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jul 2010
Piccolo Bambino Limited
39 George Street
Wurmitzer Surgical Limited
39 George Street
Heigold Motors Limited
39 George Street
Silver Star Designs Limited
39 George Street
Gladstone Bar Limited
39 George Street
Mcintosh Catering Limited
39 George Street