Shapecraft Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 28 Sep 2009. 9429031898072 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Fitness centre" (ANZSIC R911110) is how the company has been classified. The company has been managed by 4 directors: James Alyn Higgins - an active director whose contract began on 28 Sep 2009,
Judith Rae Higgins - an active director whose contract began on 28 Sep 2009,
Dougal Peter Mcewen Mason - an active director whose contract began on 31 Oct 2012,
Peter Humfrey Young - an inactive director whose contract began on 28 Sep 2009 and was terminated on 04 Oct 2012.
Updated on 14 Nov 2021, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 2 addresses this company registered, namely: an address for share register at 4 Paparata Street, Karori, Wellington 6145 (other address),
4 Paparata Street, Karori, Wellington, 6012 (physical address),
4 Paparata Street, Karori, Wellington, 6012 (registered address).
A total of 120000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (5 groups). The first group includes 20000 shares (16.67%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 30000 shares (25%). Finally the next share allocation (20000 shares 16.67%) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
232 Karori Road, Karori, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 14 Mar 2018
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 20000 | |||
Individual | Dougal Peter Mcewen Mason |
Karori Wellington 6012 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 30000 | |||
Individual | James Alyn Higgins |
Karori Wellington 6145 New Zealand |
28 Sep 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 20000 | |||
Individual | Catriona Mcewen Mason |
Raumati South Paraparaumu 5032 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 20000 | |||
Individual | Kirsten Mcewen Mason |
Lane 200 Songato Road, Pudong Shanghai 2000135 China |
01 Nov 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 30000 | |||
Individual | Judith Rae Higgins |
Karori Wellington 6145 New Zealand |
28 Sep 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Peter Humfrey Young |
Karori Wellington New Zealand |
28 Sep 2009 - 01 Nov 2012 |
James Alyn Higgins - Director
Appointment date: 28 Sep 2009
Address: Karori, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Mar 2016
Judith Rae Higgins - Director
Appointment date: 28 Sep 2009
Address: Karori, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Mar 2016
Dougal Peter Mcewen Mason - Director
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2012
Address: Karori, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Oct 2012
Peter Humfrey Young - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Sep 2009
Termination date: 04 Oct 2012
Address: Karori, Wellington 6012, New Zealand
Address used since 22 Apr 2010
The Networking Edge Limited
4 Paparata Street
C.t.l.d Limited
3 Paparata Street
Jgd Investments Limited
18 Paparata Street
Ssj Holdings Limited
18 Paparata Street
Mimosa Investments Limited
18 Paparata Street
Intercoat Systems (2002) Limited
18 Henderson Street
Activewellbeing Limited
27 Monaghan Avenue
Affiliate Limited
35 Jefferson Street
F45 Training Queenstown Limited
27 Monaghan Avenue
Fitness Systems Eastbourne Limited
67 Sunshine Avenue
Phoenix Books Limited
200 Willis Street
Proactive Martial Arts Limited
8 Selkirk Way