Dive Hq Licensing Limited was registered on 25 Nov 2009 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429031830218. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 13 directors: Richard Chitty - an active director whose contract started on 01 Jun 2014,
Michael O'loughlin - an active director whose contract started on 01 Jun 2014,
Claire Murphy - an active director whose contract started on 01 Aug 2017,
Elaine Fay Mchardy - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 Jun 2013 and was terminated on 31 Jul 2017,
Timothy Patrick Horgan - an inactive director whose contract started on 25 Nov 2009 and was terminated on 30 May 2014.
As stated in BizDb's data (last updated on 29 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: 88 Grants Rd, Papanui, Christchurch, 8053 (category: physical, registered).
Up until 01 Mar 2013, Dive Hq Licensing Limited had been using 88 Grants Road, Papanui, Christchurch as their physical address.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 3 groups (3 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 333 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Deep Blue Industries Limited (an entity) located at Mairangi Bay, Auckland postcode 0630.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 33.4% shares (exactly 334 shares) and includes
Dive Hq Christchurch 2013 Limited - located at Seatoun, Wellington.
The next share allotment (333 shares, 33.3%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Murphy & Thompson Limited, located at Dannevirke, Dannevirke (an entity). Dive Hq Licensing Limited has been classified as "Skin diving equipment retailing" (business classification G424150).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 88 Grants Road, Papanui, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 25 Feb 2013 to 01 Mar 2013
Address #2: 5 Ferngrove Place, Parklands, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Apr 2012 to 25 Feb 2013
Address #3: 11 Greenway Rise, Gulf Harbour, Whangaparaoa, 0930 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Mar 2011 to 05 Apr 2012
Address #4: Rhb Chartered Accountant Ltd,, The Hub ,level 1,525 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3144 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 09 Nov 2010 to 04 Mar 2011
Address #5: 33 Paparoa Rd, Rd2, Tauranga New Zealand
Registered address used from 25 Nov 2009 to 09 Nov 2010
Address #6: 33 Paparoad Rd, Rd2, Tauranga New Zealand
Physical address used from 25 Nov 2009 to 09 Nov 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 05 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 333 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Deep Blue Industries Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033172637 |
Mairangi Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
25 Nov 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 334 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Dive Hq Christchurch 2013 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030960855 |
Seatoun Wellington 6022 New Zealand |
12 Sep 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 333 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Murphy & Thompson Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034635506 |
Dannevirke Dannevirke 4930 New Zealand |
25 Nov 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Uchumi Trading Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035582243 Company Number: 1475364 |
25 Nov 2009 - 08 Nov 2011 | |
Entity | Diving Academy Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031103183 Company Number: 3382672 |
Stanmore Bay Whangaparaoa 0932 New Zealand |
08 Nov 2011 - 14 Oct 2019 |
Entity | Kiwi Divers New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032617559 Company Number: 2160953 |
25 Nov 2009 - 06 Sep 2016 | |
Entity | Adventure Dive (waikato) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030081741 Company Number: 4620119 |
06 May 2015 - 06 Sep 2016 | |
Entity | Neptune Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034038925 Company Number: 1831285 |
25 Nov 2009 - 16 Nov 2015 | |
Entity | Ascent Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032183238 Company Number: 2270634 |
25 Nov 2009 - 08 Nov 2011 | |
Entity | Adventure Dive (bop) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030883802 Company Number: 3655951 |
Rotorua Null 3010 New Zealand |
13 Dec 2011 - 14 Oct 2019 |
Entity | Submerged Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030414372 Company Number: 4154478 |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
16 Nov 2015 - 14 Oct 2019 |
Entity | Dive Hq Bait & Tackle Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033039671 Company Number: 2054046 |
25 Nov 2009 - 06 May 2015 | |
Entity | Liquid Asset 2013 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037999513 Company Number: 875988 |
25 Nov 2009 - 12 Sep 2013 | |
Entity | Portage Dive Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038628009 Company Number: 643246 |
25 Nov 2009 - 06 Sep 2016 | |
Entity | Milos Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038935510 Company Number: 560464 |
25 Nov 2009 - 06 Sep 2016 | |
Entity | Adventure Dive (waikato) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030081741 Company Number: 4620119 |
06 May 2015 - 06 Sep 2016 | |
Entity | Submerged Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030414372 Company Number: 4154478 |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
16 Nov 2015 - 14 Oct 2019 |
Entity | Ascent Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032183238 Company Number: 2270634 |
25 Nov 2009 - 08 Nov 2011 | |
Entity | Uchumi Trading Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035582243 Company Number: 1475364 |
25 Nov 2009 - 08 Nov 2011 | |
Entity | Kiwi Divers New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032617559 Company Number: 2160953 |
25 Nov 2009 - 06 Sep 2016 | |
Entity | Neptune Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034038925 Company Number: 1831285 |
25 Nov 2009 - 16 Nov 2015 | |
Entity | Scuba Doo Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035309659 Company Number: 1529733 |
25 Nov 2009 - 08 Nov 2011 | |
Entity | Out There Operations Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032382990 Company Number: 2212012 |
06 Aug 2010 - 08 Nov 2011 | |
Entity | Scuba Services Hawke Bay Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032146813 Company Number: 2282134 |
25 Nov 2009 - 06 Aug 2010 | |
Entity | Adventure Dive (rotorua) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035342199 Company Number: 1523737 |
25 Nov 2009 - 13 Dec 2011 | |
Entity | Dive Hq Bait & Tackle Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033039671 Company Number: 2054046 |
25 Nov 2009 - 06 May 2015 | |
Entity | Scuba Services Hawke Bay Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032146813 Company Number: 2282134 |
25 Nov 2009 - 06 Aug 2010 | |
Entity | Scuba Doo Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035309659 Company Number: 1529733 |
25 Nov 2009 - 08 Nov 2011 | |
Entity | Out There Operations Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032382990 Company Number: 2212012 |
06 Aug 2010 - 08 Nov 2011 | |
Entity | Adventure Dive (rotorua) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035342199 Company Number: 1523737 |
25 Nov 2009 - 13 Dec 2011 | |
Entity | Milos Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038935510 Company Number: 560464 |
25 Nov 2009 - 06 Sep 2016 | |
Entity | Portage Dive Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038628009 Company Number: 643246 |
25 Nov 2009 - 06 Sep 2016 | |
Entity | Adventure Dive (bop) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030883802 Company Number: 3655951 |
Rotorua Null 3010 New Zealand |
13 Dec 2011 - 14 Oct 2019 |
Entity | Diving Academy Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031103183 Company Number: 3382672 |
Stanmore Bay Whangaparaoa 0932 New Zealand |
08 Nov 2011 - 14 Oct 2019 |
Entity | Liquid Asset 2013 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037999513 Company Number: 875988 |
25 Nov 2009 - 12 Sep 2013 |
Richard Chitty - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jun 2014
Address: Spreydon, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2014
Michael O'loughlin - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jun 2014
Address: Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2014
Claire Murphy - Director
Appointment date: 01 Aug 2017
Address: Petone, Lower Hutt, 5012 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2017
Elaine Fay Mchardy - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Jun 2013
Termination date: 31 Jul 2017
Address: Lynmore, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Jun 2013
Timothy Patrick Horgan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Nov 2009
Termination date: 30 May 2014
Address: Feilding,
Address used since 25 Nov 2009
Shane Thompson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Sep 2011
Termination date: 30 May 2014
Address: Maungaraki, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Sep 2011
Brian Robert Franks - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Nov 2009
Termination date: 02 Sep 2013
Address: Rd2, Christchurch,
Address used since 25 Nov 2009
Kevin Hobbs - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Nov 2010
Termination date: 01 Jul 2012
Address: Kamo, Whangarei, 0140 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Nov 2010
Grant Searancke - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Aug 2010
Termination date: 16 Jun 2011
Address: Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Aug 2010
Anthony Horace Wolland - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Nov 2009
Termination date: 31 Dec 2010
Address: Rd2, Tauranga,
Address used since 25 Nov 2009
Darrell Murray Bird - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Nov 2009
Termination date: 07 Dec 2010
Address: Whitianga,
Address used since 25 Nov 2009
Nicki Clithero - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Aug 2010
Termination date: 07 Dec 2010
Address: Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Aug 2010
Kevin Hobbs - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Nov 2009
Termination date: 06 Aug 2010
Address: Kamo, Whangarei,
Address used since 25 Nov 2009
Sherie O'malley Limited
88 Grants Road
Tokomaru Bay Limited
96 Grants Road
Lignin Group Limited
26 Proctor Street
Pure Deals Limited
23 Proctor Street
Total Marketing Solutions Limited
79 Perry Street
Sterling House (nz) Limited
79 Perry Street
Amphibious Nz Limited
24 Lane Street
Dive Kapiti 2014 Limited
44 Ihakara Street
Franklin Hunting & Fishing Limited
134 Wortley Rd
Mac Pan Limited
209 Sutherland Road
Scuba Equipment Servicing Limited
86 The Esplanade
Southern Diver Limited
37 Manor Place