Tastegreece Food Trading Limited was launched on 18 Nov 2009 and issued an NZBN of 9429031764292. The registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Ioannis Donald Montes - an active director whose contract started on 18 Nov 2009,
Ioannis Montes - an active director whose contract started on 18 Nov 2009,
Christos Montes - an inactive director whose contract started on 18 Nov 2009 and was terminated on 02 Oct 2014.
According to BizDb's information (last updated on 10 Sep 2024), this company filed 1 address: Suite 2, 12 Parkhead Place, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 (type: physical, service).
Up until 12 Jul 2022, Tastegreece Food Trading Limited had been using Suite 7, 25 Anzac Road, Browns Bay, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 490 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Tsaliagkou, Aimilia (an individual) located at Waiake, Auckland postcode 0630.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 51 per cent shares (exactly 510 shares) and includes
Montes, Ioannis - located at Waiake, Auckland. Tastegreece Food Trading Limited was categorised as "Specialised food retailing nec" (business classification G412950).
Principal place of activity
Suite 2, 12 Parkhead Place, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Suite 7, 25 Anzac Road, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 Jul 2020 to 12 Jul 2022
Address #2: Unit 2, 6 Wilk Lane, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Physical address used from 10 Jul 2014 to 13 Jul 2020
Address #3: Unit 2, 6 Wilk Lane, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Registered address used from 10 Jul 2014 to 29 Mar 2022
Address #4: 6 Wilk Lane, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Jun 2014 to 10 Jul 2014
Address #5: Unit A5, 7/9 Tait Place, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Nov 2011 to 10 Jun 2014
Address #6: 13 Capricorn Place, North Shore, Browns Bay 0630 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 Apr 2010 to 18 Nov 2011
Address #7: 257 Sunset Road, Mairangi Bay, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 18 Nov 2009 to 13 Apr 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 01 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 490 | |||
Individual | Tsaliagkou, Aimilia |
Waiake Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
24 Dec 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 510 | |||
Director | Montes, Ioannis |
Waiake Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
17 Oct 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Van Heerden, Jerilyn Marie |
Torbay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
07 Apr 2021 - 18 Jul 2022 |
Individual | Kalatzi, Georgia |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
24 Dec 2012 - 02 Oct 2014 |
Individual | Montes, Ioannis Donald |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
18 Nov 2009 - 17 Oct 2019 |
Individual | Montes, Christos |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
18 Nov 2009 - 12 Jun 2015 |
Ioannis Donald Montes - Director
Appointment date: 18 Nov 2009
Address: Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 01 May 2013
Address: Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2016
Ioannis Montes - Director
Appointment date: 18 Nov 2009
Address: Waiake, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2022
Address: Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2016
Christos Montes - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Nov 2009
Termination date: 02 Oct 2014
Address: Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Apr 2013
Biovit Gmp Laboratories Limited
6 Wilk Lane
Onyx Software Limited
7 / 8 Wilk Lane
Ecosheds Limited
4 Wilk Lane
Brian Holgate Panelbeaters (1994) Limited
746 Beach Road
Browns Bay Mowers And Heating Limited
751 Beach Road
Payit Limited
Suite 1, 740 Beach Road
Bruzies Limited
40 Holt Avenue
Han Neng Limited
6 Acacia Road
Lemon Thai Limited
Flat 2, 41 Bute Road
Premium Spices Torbay Limited
Flat 2, 38 Carlisle Road
Roretta Enterprises Limited
54a Galaxy Drive
Texas Rangers Limited
Flat 1, 324 Beach Road