Crystalp Jewellery Limited was incorporated on 15 Dec 2009 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429031727297. The registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Phillippa Lorraine Deans - an active director whose contract began on 15 Dec 2009,
William George Russell Deans - an active director whose contract began on 15 Dec 2009,
Christopher Rodney Drake - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Dec 2009 and was terminated on 09 Jul 2010.
According to our data (last updated on 01 Aug 2024), the company filed 1 address: 2427 Bealey Road, Hororata R D 2, Darfield 7572 (category: physical, registered).
A total of 1200 shares are issued to 3 groups (4 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 30 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Deans, William George Russell (an individual) located at Hororata R D 2, Darfield 7572.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 600 shares) and includes
Deans, Phillippa Lorraine - located at Hororata R D 2, Darfield 7572.
The next share allocation (570 shares, 47.5%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Deans, William George Russell, located at Hororata R D 2, Darfield 7572 (an individual),
Deans, Phillippa Lorraine, located at Hororata R D 2, Darfield 7572 (an individual). Crystalp Jewellery Limited was classified as "Wholesale trade nec" (business classification F373970).
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1200
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 24 Jan 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 30 | |||
Individual | Deans, William George Russell |
Hororata R D 2 Darfield 7572 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 600 | |||
Individual | Deans, Phillippa Lorraine |
Hororata R D 2 Darfield 7572 7572 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 570 | |||
Individual | Deans, William George Russell |
Hororata R D 2 Darfield 7572 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2009 - |
Individual | Deans, Phillippa Lorraine |
Hororata R D 2 Darfield 7572 7572 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Drake, Christopher Rodney |
Sumner Christchurch New Zealand |
15 Dec 2009 - 20 Oct 2010 |
Individual | Saunders, Geoffrey Childers |
Willowcreek Lane Christchurch New Zealand |
03 Mar 2010 - 03 Oct 2019 |
Phillippa Lorraine Deans - Director
Appointment date: 15 Dec 2009
Address: Hororata R D 2, Darfield, 7572 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Dec 2009
William George Russell Deans - Director
Appointment date: 15 Dec 2009
Address: Hororata R D 2, Darfield, 7572 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Dec 2009
Christopher Rodney Drake - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Dec 2009
Termination date: 09 Jul 2010
Address: Sumner, Christchurch, New Zealand
Address used since 15 Dec 2009
Crystalp Jewellery Nz Limited
2427 Bealey Road
Aonghus Nz Limited
214 Hacketts Road
Enerpro Feeds Limited
66 High Street
Feather Merchants (nz) Limited
13 Cameron Street
Hqc Solutions Limited
220 Old West Coast Road
Majestic Trading Limited
66 High Street
Trabeth Textiles Limited
21a Byron Street,