Frost Foundation Limited was registered on 20 Jan 2010 and issued a business number of 9429031694094. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Christine Pamela Frost - an active director whose contract began on 20 Jan 2010,
Murray Warden Frost - an active director whose contract began on 20 Jan 2010.
As stated in BizDb's information (last updated on 16 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: 160 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 (types include: physical, service).
Until 19 Jul 2012, Frost Foundation Limited had been using C/-Mcintyre Dick & Partners, 160 Spey Street, Invercargill as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 3 groups (4 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Frost, Christine Pamela (an individual) located at Riccarton, Christchurch postcode 8041.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 1 per cent shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Frost, Murray Warden - located at Riccarton, Christchurch.
The next share allotment (98 shares, 98%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Frost, Murray Warden, located at 27A Rata Street Riccarton, Christchurch (an individual),
Frost, Christine Pamela, located at 27A Rata Street Riccarton, Christchurch (an individual).
Previous addresses
Address: C/-mcintyre Dick & Partners, 160 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 21 Jul 2011 to 19 Jul 2012
Address: C/-mcintyre Dick & Partners Ltd, 160 Spey Street, Invercargill New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 23 Feb 2010 to 21 Jul 2011
Address: 33 Jeffreys Road, Christchurch
Registered & physical address used from 20 Jan 2010 to 23 Feb 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 18 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Frost, Christine Pamela |
Riccarton Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
20 Jan 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Frost, Murray Warden |
Riccarton Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
20 Jan 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Individual | Frost, Murray Warden |
27a Rata Street Riccarton Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
20 Jan 2010 - |
Individual | Frost, Christine Pamela |
27a Rata Street Riccarton Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
20 Jan 2010 - |
Christine Pamela Frost - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2010
Address: Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 06 May 2021
Address: Fendalton, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jul 2011
Murray Warden Frost - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2010
Address: Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 06 May 2021
Address: Fendalton, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jul 2011
Jimmys Pies Limited
160 Spey Street
Altitude Resurfacing Limited
160 Spey Street
The Reinforcer Limited
160 Spey Street
Ultra-scan Southern Southland Limited
160 Spey Street
Mollison & Associates Limited
160 Spey Street
Mbss Limited
160 Spey Street