L&M Santarosa Investment Limited was started on 15 Apr 2010 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429031584487. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Min Xu - an active director whose contract started on 15 Apr 2010,
Liang She - an active director whose contract started on 15 Apr 2010.
As stated in the BizDb data (last updated on 16 Sep 2024), this company registered 2 addresses: 78 Grove Road, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 (office address),
2 Alfred Street, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 (physical address),
2 Alfred Street, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 (registered address),
2 Alfred Street, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 (service address) among others.
Up to 29 May 2017, L&M Santarosa Investment Limited had been using 22 Scott Street, Blenheim, Blenheim as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 1 group (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Xu, Min (an individual) located at Witherlea, Blenheim postcode 7201,
She, Liang (an individual) located at Witherlea, Blenheim postcode 7201. L&M Santarosa Investment Limited has been categorised as "Caravan park and camping ground" (business classification H440015).
Principal place of activity
78 Grove Road, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 22 Scott Street, Blenheim, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 06 Apr 2016 to 29 May 2017
Address #2: 78 Grove Road, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Physical address used from 11 Sep 2014 to 06 Apr 2016
Address #3: 78 Grove Road, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Sep 2014 to 06 Apr 2016
Address #4: 31 Seaward Rd, Invercargill, 9825 New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 Jun 2014 to 01 Sep 2014
Address #5: 31 Seaward Rd, Invercargill, 9825 New Zealand
Physical address used from 06 Jun 2014 to 11 Sep 2014
Address #6: 128 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Nov 2011 to 06 Jun 2014
Address #7: 31 Seaward Rd, Edendale New Zealand
Physical address used from 10 Jun 2010 to 17 Nov 2011
Address #8: 31 Seaward Rd, Edendale, Southland New Zealand
Registered address used from 10 Jun 2010 to 17 Nov 2011
Address #9: 24 Fife Cre Tamatea, Napier
Registered & physical address used from 15 Apr 2010 to 10 Jun 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 28 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Xu, Min |
Witherlea Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2010 - |
Individual | She, Liang |
Witherlea Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
15 Apr 2010 - |
Min Xu - Director
Appointment date: 15 Apr 2010
Address: Witherlea, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Apr 2021
Address: Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2020
Address: Witherlea, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jun 2016
Liang She - Director
Appointment date: 15 Apr 2010
Address: Witherlea, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Apr 2021
Address: Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2020
Address: Witherlea, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jun 2016
Blenheim Motor Camp & Backpackers Limited
27 Budge Street
K & J Trustees No1 Limited
52 Grove Road
Russ Tree Services Limited
52 Grove Road
Phw Contracting Limited
52 Grove Road
Djc Henriksen Contracting Limited
52 Grove Road
D.j.w. Construction Limited
52 Grove Road
Cable Bay Camp Limited
155 Milton Street
Hotspot Promotion (n Z) Limited
15 Renata Road
Parklands Marina Holiday Park Limited
59 High Street
Pinedale Camp Limited
2 Alfred Street
R & R Mccaa 2006 Limited
14 Charles Street
Wharariki Holiday Park Limited
Lifestyle Accounting