Sm & T Homes Limited was incorporated on 28 Apr 2010 and issued a business number of 9429031560139. The registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Marewa Patricia Glover - an active director whose contract started on 28 Apr 2010,
Stephen Francis Piner - an active director whose contract started on 28 Apr 2010.
According to our information (last updated on 06 Aug 2024), the company registered 3 addresses: 1172 East Coast Road, Rd 4, Auckland, 0794 (physical address),
1172 East Coast Road, Rd 4, Auckland, 0794 (registered address),
1172 East Coast Road, Rd 4, Auckland, 0794 (service address),
1172 East Coast Road, Rd 4, Auckland, 0794 (other address) among others.
Up until 23 Jun 2020, Sm & T Homes Limited had been using 109 Carlisle Road, Torbay, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 40 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Piner, Stephen Francis (an individual) located at Rd 4, Auckland postcode 0794.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 60 per cent shares (exactly 60 shares) and includes
Glover, Marewa Patricia - located at Rd 4, Auckland. Sm & T Homes Limited was categorised as "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160).
Principal place of activity
4 Gulf Crest, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 109 Carlisle Road, Torbay, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 23 May 2016 to 23 Jun 2020
Address #2: 91 Rising Parade, Fairview Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Jun 2015 to 23 May 2016
Address #3: 4 Gulf Crest, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 Jun 2011 to 05 Jun 2015
Address #4: 26a Church Crescent, Panmure, Auckland 1072 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 28 Apr 2010 to 08 Jun 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 07 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 40 | |||
Individual | Piner, Stephen Francis |
Rd 4 Auckland 0794 New Zealand |
28 Apr 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 60 | |||
Individual | Glover, Marewa Patricia |
Rd 4 Auckland 0794 New Zealand |
28 Apr 2010 - |
Marewa Patricia Glover - Director
Appointment date: 28 Apr 2010
Address: Rd 4, Auckland, 0794 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Jun 2020
Address: Torbay, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 15 May 2016
Stephen Francis Piner - Director
Appointment date: 28 Apr 2010
Address: Rd 4, Auckland, 0794 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Jun 2020
Address: Torbay, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 15 May 2016
Complete Bathrooms Group Nz Limited
119 Clovelly Road
Egy Limited
119 Clovelly Road
Meta Trustee Limited
119 Clovelly Road
Faith Based Pizza Limited
115a Clovelly Road
Jenjen Limited
158 Clovelly Road
Atenine Limited
17a Gulf Crest
Hanella One Limited
105 Waller Avenue
Jhj Investment Limited
103a Clovelly Road
Joyeux Investments Trustee Company Limited
28 Waller Avenue
Joyeux Property No. 1 Limited
28 Waller Avenue
Slc Limited
172a Clovelly Road
Taliesyn Eastern Beach Limited
7a The Esplanade