Building Plus Limited was started on 06 May 2010 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031546256. The registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Bingbing Li - an active director whose contract began on 06 May 2010,
Wei Zhang - an inactive director whose contract began on 06 May 2010 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2012.
According to our data (last updated on 07 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: 8 Bell Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 (category: registered, service).
Up to 20 Oct 2015, Building Plus Limited had been using 100 Union Road, Howick, Manukau as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 75 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Li, Bingbing (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 25% shares (exactly 25 shares) and includes
Wang, Xiangyu - located at Remuera, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 100 Union Road, Howick, Manukau, 2014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 14 Dec 2010 to 20 Oct 2015
Address #2: 18 Higgs Rd, Mt Wellington, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 May 2010 to 14 Dec 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 03 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 75 | |||
Individual | Li, Bingbing |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
06 May 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 25 | |||
Individual | Wang, Xiangyu |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
14 Nov 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Zhang, Wei |
Mt Wellington Auckland New Zealand |
06 May 2010 - 28 Jul 2012 |
Bingbing Li - Director
Appointment date: 06 May 2010
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2023
Address: Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Aug 2015
Wei Zhang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 May 2010
Termination date: 31 Mar 2012
Address: Mt Wellington, Auckland, New Zealand
Address used since 06 May 2010
Kingra Trust Limited
45 Sunderlands Road
Kingra Enterprises Limited
45 Sunderlands Road
Mlk Enterprises Limited
45 Sunderlands Road
Gas Grooming Limited
45 Sunderlands Road
Krp Investments Limited
1 Mimosa Place
Campbell Composites And Consulting Limited
27 Dianne-louise Drive