Pastoral Improvements Limited, a registered company, was registered on 10 Jun 2010. 9429031531580 is the business number it was issued. The company has been managed by 4 directors: Riley Patrick O'neill - an active director whose contract began on 12 Nov 2014,
William Woodhouse Lee - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Jul 2020 and was terminated on 31 Oct 2022,
Lucy Kate Collier-Christian - an inactive director whose contract began on 10 Jun 2010 and was terminated on 12 Dec 2014,
Riley Patrick O'neill - an inactive director whose contract began on 10 Jun 2010 and was terminated on 13 Oct 2010.
Last updated on 14 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 2 addresses this company registered, namely: 151 Burnett Street, Ashburton, 7700 (registered address),
151 Burnett Street, Ashburton, 7700 (service address),
123 Burnett Street, Ashburton, 7700 (physical address).
Pastoral Improvements Limited had been using 123 Burnett Street, Ashburton as their registered address up to 01 Feb 2024.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - O'neill, Riley Patrick - located at 7700, Maori Hill, Timaru.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 123 Burnett Street, Ashburton, 7700 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 04 Jun 2015 to 01 Feb 2024
Address #2: 97 Normanby Road, Rd 14, Rakaia, 7784 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 23 Dec 2014 to 04 Jun 2015
Address #3: 15 George Street, Pleasant Point, 7903 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Mar 2013 to 23 Dec 2014
Address #4: 68 Ranui Avenue, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Physical address used from 24 Apr 2012 to 18 Mar 2013
Address #5: 68 Ranui Avenue, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Registered address used from 09 Mar 2012 to 18 Mar 2013
Address #6: 17 Mellish Street, Rangitata, Rd22, Geradine New Zealand
Physical address used from 10 Jun 2010 to 24 Apr 2012
Address #7: 17 Mellish Street, Rangitata, Rd22, Geradine New Zealand
Registered address used from 10 Jun 2010 to 09 Mar 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 28 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | O'neill, Riley Patrick |
Maori Hill Timaru 7910 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2014 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | O'neill, Riley Patrick |
Rangitata Rd22, Geraldine New Zealand |
10 Jun 2010 - 20 Oct 2010 |
Individual | Collier-christian, Lucy Kate |
Pleasant Point 7903 New Zealand |
10 Jun 2010 - 15 Dec 2014 |
Riley Patrick O'neill - Director
Appointment date: 12 Nov 2014
Address: Rd 14, Rakaia, 7784 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Nov 2014
Address: Maori Hill, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2019
William Woodhouse Lee - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2020
Termination date: 31 Oct 2022
Address: 3 R.d, Amberley, 7483 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2020
Lucy Kate Collier-christian - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Jun 2010
Termination date: 12 Dec 2014
Address: Pleasant Point, 7903 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Mar 2013
Riley Patrick O'neill - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Jun 2010
Termination date: 13 Oct 2010
Address: Rangitata, Rd22, Geraldine, New Zealand
Address used since 10 Jun 2010
Diesel Performance Solutions Canterbury Limited
123 Burnett Street
Matthews Design Limited
123 Burnett Street
Birkett Contracting Limited
123 Burnett Street
Eskdale Farm Limited
123 Burnett Street
Rakaia Seed Cleaning (2009) Limited
123 Burnett Street
Merope Holdings Limited
123 Burnett Street