Fortitude Textiles Limited was launched on 26 May 2010 and issued a business number of 9429031527989. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Lavinia Anne Calvert - an active director whose contract started on 26 May 2010,
Matthew James Calvert - an active director whose contract started on 01 Mar 2023,
Grant Bruce Scott - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 May 2010 and was terminated on 12 Mar 2012.
According to our information (updated on 28 Jul 2024), the company registered 4 addresses: Floor 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (physical address),
Floor 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (registered address),
Floor 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (service address),
Floor 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (other address) among others.
Until 12 Oct 2021, Fortitude Textiles Limited had been using Flat 313, 28 College Hill, Freemans Bay, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 84250 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 84250 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Calvert, Lavinia Anne (an individual) located at Freemans Bay, Auckland postcode 1011. Fortitude Textiles Limited was classified as "Fabrics textile retailing" (business classification G421430).
Other active addresses
Address #4: Floor 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Physical & registered & service address used from 12 Oct 2021
Principal place of activity
17 Augustus Terrace, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Flat 313, 28 College Hill, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Mar 2020 to 12 Oct 2021
Address #2: Level 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Physical address used from 03 Mar 2017 to 17 Mar 2020
Address #3: Level 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 Apr 2012 to 17 Mar 2020
Address #4: 229 Moray Place, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Physical address used from 22 Feb 2012 to 03 Mar 2017
Address #5: 229 Moray Place, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 Feb 2012 to 13 Apr 2012
Address #6: 9a Marion Street, Macandrew Bay, Dunedin 9014, Otago New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 May 2010 to 22 Feb 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 84250
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 07 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 84250 | |||
Individual | Calvert, Lavinia Anne |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
26 May 2010 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Tung, Pei-chi |
Shinjuku Tokyo 162-0835 Japan |
23 Mar 2011 - 28 May 2024 |
Individual | Campbell, Marian Barbara |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 New Zealand |
04 Oct 2011 - 28 May 2024 |
Individual | Scott, Grant Bruce |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 New Zealand |
26 May 2010 - 28 May 2024 |
Individual | Hooker, David |
Murrays Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
07 May 2012 - 28 May 2024 |
Individual | Melchior, Barbara |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
22 Jan 2011 - 28 May 2024 |
Other | Glen Campbell Trust | 22 Jan 2011 - 04 Oct 2011 | |
Individual | Birtle, Robin |
Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 Japan |
22 Jan 2011 - 28 May 2024 |
Individual | Melchior, Phillip |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
22 Jan 2011 - 28 May 2024 |
Individual | Hooker, Michele |
Murrays Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
07 May 2012 - 28 May 2024 |
Individual | Campbell, Marian Barbara |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 New Zealand |
04 Oct 2011 - 28 May 2024 |
Individual | Campbell, Marian Barbara |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 New Zealand |
04 Oct 2011 - 28 May 2024 |
Individual | Campbell, John Baird |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 New Zealand |
04 Oct 2011 - 28 May 2024 |
Individual | Campbell, John Baird |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 New Zealand |
04 Oct 2011 - 28 May 2024 |
Individual | Campbell, John Baird |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 New Zealand |
04 Oct 2011 - 28 May 2024 |
Entity | Dac Campbell Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046396938 Company Number: 6484223 |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 New Zealand |
09 Mar 2020 - 28 May 2024 |
Individual | Armstrong, John Laurence |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 New Zealand |
04 Oct 2011 - 09 Mar 2020 |
Other | Null - Glen Campbell Trust | 22 Jan 2011 - 04 Oct 2011 | |
Other | Null - Zenith Trust | 22 Jan 2011 - 04 Oct 2011 | |
Other | Zenith Trust | 22 Jan 2011 - 04 Oct 2011 | |
Individual | Roberts, Nicola Mary |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 New Zealand |
04 Oct 2011 - 09 Mar 2020 |
Lavinia Anne Calvert - Director
Appointment date: 26 May 2010
Address: Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Sep 2018
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Jul 2016
Address: Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Jun 2017
Matthew James Calvert - Director
Appointment date: 01 Mar 2023
Address: Island Bay, Wellington, 6023 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2023
Grant Bruce Scott - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 May 2010
Termination date: 12 Mar 2012
Address: Macandrew Bay, Dunedin 9014, Otago, New Zealand
Address used since 26 May 2010
Innovative Health Technologies (n Z ) Limited
Level 5, 229 Moray Place
Farm 18 Limited
Level 1, 205 Princes Street
Lasered By Lynette Limited
Level 1, 243 Princes Street
Ben Ledi Farming Limited
Level 5, 229 Moray Place
Hbx Limited
Level 3, 258 Stuart Street
B J D Trustee Company Limited
Level 7, Forsyth Barr House, The Octagon
Fuseon Graphics Nz Limited
503 River Road
Haralds Limited
Unit 1/47 Birmingham Drive
Interior Girls Limited
54 King Street
Sewing Kit Limited
82 Penruddock Rise
The Linen Collection Limited
29 The Mall
The Oamaru Textile Exchange Limited
13 Tyne Street