Bug King Limited was launched on 23 Jul 2010 and issued an NZBN of 9429031481120. The registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Mark Anthony Mcdonald - an active director whose contract began on 23 Jul 2010,
Melissa Lianne Brown - an inactive director whose contract began on 23 Jul 2010 and was terminated on 12 Apr 2011.
According to the BizDb information (last updated on 22 Jul 2024), this company uses 3 addresses: Unit 5, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (registered address),
Unit 5, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (service address),
Flat 2, 10 Church Crescent, Panmure, Auckland, 1072 (postal address),
Flat 2, 10 Church Crescent, Panmure, Auckland, 1072 (delivery address) among others.
Up to 09 May 2023, Bug King Limited had been using 156A Penrose Road, Mount Wellington, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb found previous aliases used by this company: from 28 Jun 2010 to 22 Apr 2011 they were named Simple Innovation Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Mcdonald, Mark Anthony (a director) located at Panmure, Auckland postcode 1072. Bug King Limited was classified as "Pest control service nec" (ANZSIC N731210).
Principal place of activity
4/10 Church Cres, Panmure, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 156a Penrose Road, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 08 Dec 2020 to 09 May 2023
Address #2: Flat 10e Eclipse Apartments, 156 Vincent Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Jul 2020 to 08 Dec 2020
Address #3: Level 3, 27 Bath Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 16 Feb 2018 to 06 Jul 2020
Address #4: 511 Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Jul 2017 to 16 Feb 2018
Address #5: 4/10 Church Cres, Panmure, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Physical address used from 26 Sep 2014 to 10 Jul 2017
Address #6: Level 2, 2a Augustus Terrace, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered address used from 23 Jan 2012 to 10 Jul 2017
Address #7: 30a Ussher Place, Pakuranga Heights, Manukau, 2010 New Zealand
Physical address used from 20 Apr 2011 to 26 Sep 2014
Address #8: 30a Ussher Place, Pakuranga Heights, Manukau, 2010 New Zealand
Registered address used from 20 Apr 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
Address #9: 46 Tahapa Crescent, Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 23 Jul 2010 to 20 Apr 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 09 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Mcdonald, Mark Anthony |
Panmure Auckland 1072 New Zealand |
23 Jul 2010 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Gellert Ivanson Trustee No 2 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031534956 Company Number: 2487928 |
16-20 St Heliers Bay Road St Heliers, Auckland Null New Zealand |
23 Nov 2012 - 10 Oct 2022 |
Individual | Brown, Melissa Lianne |
Half Moon Bay Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
23 Jul 2010 - 10 Oct 2022 |
Individual | Brown, Melissa Lianne |
Half Moon Bay Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
23 Jul 2010 - 10 Oct 2022 |
Entity | Gellert Ivanson Trustee No 2 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031534956 Company Number: 2487928 |
20 St Heliers Bay Road St Heliers, Auckland Null 1071 New Zealand |
23 Nov 2012 - 10 Oct 2022 |
Mark Anthony Mcdonald - Director
Appointment date: 23 Jul 2010
Address: Panmure, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 24 May 2022
Address: Panmure, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Jun 2020
Address: Panmure, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Jun 2015
Melissa Lianne Brown - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Jul 2010
Termination date: 12 Apr 2011
Address: Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jul 2010
2 Sunset View Road Limited
2 Sunset View Road
Outdoorsman Limited
2 Sunset View Road
Lexiflowra Cosmetics Limited
4 Sunset View Road
Ksp Limited
50 Lagoon Drive
Neil Amun Properties Limited
22 Domain Road
Panmure Squash Rackets Club Incorporated
46 Lagoon Drive
All Pest Services Limited
54 Megan Ave
Brothers In Arms Group Of Companies Limited
98a Great South Road
Pestwise New Zealand Limited
16b Whitford Avenue
The Bug Guy Limited
28 Motu Place Mt Wellington
Truly Kiwi Limited
Flat 6, 22g Jellicoe Road
World Class Pest Control Limited
82 Archmillen Avenue