Beans Trading Limited was incorporated on 10 Aug 2010 and issued a business number of 9429031426916. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Rajdeep Singh Sandhu - an active director whose contract started on 17 Jun 2015,
Harmeet Sandhu - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Aug 2010 and was terminated on 16 Jun 2015.
As stated in our information (last updated on 20 Jul 2024), the company uses 1 address: 29 Kelvin Hart Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (types include: registered, physical).
Up until 26 Nov 2021, Beans Trading Limited had been using 147 Clovelly Road, Bucklands Beach, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 99 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Sandhu, Rajdeep Singh (an individual) located at East Tamaki, Auckland postcode 2013.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 1 per cent shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Sandhu, Harmeet - located at East Tamaki, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
147 Clovelly Road, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 147 Clovelly Road, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 Feb 2013 to 26 Nov 2021
Address #2: 7 Ardee Close, East Tamaki, Manukau, 2016 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Aug 2010 to 15 Feb 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 01 Aug 2022
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | Sandhu, Rajdeep Singh |
East Tamaki Auckland 2013 New Zealand |
10 Aug 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Sandhu, Harmeet |
East Tamaki Auckland 2013 New Zealand |
10 Aug 2010 - |
Rajdeep Singh Sandhu - Director
Appointment date: 17 Jun 2015
Address: East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Nov 2021
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jun 2015
Harmeet Sandhu - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Aug 2010
Termination date: 16 Jun 2015
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Aug 2013
H&l Fresh Produce Limited
145 Clovelly Road
Besant Investments Limited
155 Clovelly Road
Hanella One Limited
105 Waller Avenue
Legend Investments Limited
14a Bucklands Beach Road
Legend Trustees Limited
14a Bucklands Beach Road
New Zealand Finance Solutions Limited
14a Bucklands Beach Road