Essm Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 16 Aug 2010. 9429031418065 is the NZBN it was issued. "Investment company operation" (business classification K624050) is how the company has been classified. The company has been supervised by 1 director, named Geoffrey Stephen Smith - an active director whose contract started on 16 Aug 2010.
Last updated on 03 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 82 Mangatawhiri Road, Omaha, 0986 (category: postal, office).
Essm Limited had been using Level 10, Pwc Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland as their registered address until 16 Aug 2017.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 1 share) - F H Trustee Company Limited - located at 0986, 20 Beaumont Street, Freemans Bay,, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
82 Mangatawhiri Road, Omaha, 0986 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 10, Pwc Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 Sep 2013 to 16 Aug 2017
Address #2: Pwc Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Aug 2010 to 03 Sep 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 09 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | F H Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037234775 |
20 Beaumont Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
16 Aug 2010 - |
Geoffrey Stephen Smith - Director
Appointment date: 16 Aug 2010
Address: Omaha, Auckland, 0986 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Aug 2017
Willy Holdings Limited
51 Kokopu Street
Ma De Holdings Limited
51 Kokopu Street
Den Mark Properties Limited
51 Kokopu Street
Denlyn Limited
51 Kokopu Street
Ferndale Estate Limited
51 Kokopu Street
Kewaicorp Limited
22 Kewai Street
Annao Limited
545 Hibiscus Coast Highway
Copper Limited
30 Dungarvon Place
Miranda Investments Limited
596 Leigh Road
Rodney & Waitemata Times Limited
18-22 Mill Lane
The Warehouse Investments Limited
Withers Building
Vintage Group Limited
243 Mangatawhiri Road