Mcnab Farms Limited was launched on 29 Oct 2010 and issued a number of 9429031349215. The registered LTD company has been run by 1 director, named Anthony James Hugh Mcnab - an active director whose contract began on 29 Oct 2010.
According to BizDb's database (last updated on 05 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 151 Burnett Street, Ashburton, Ashburton, 7700 (type: registered, physical).
Up to 11 Mar 2016, Mcnab Farms Limited had been using 255 Havelock Street, Ashburton as their physical address.
A total of 14000 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 9000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Mcnab, Anthony James Hugh (a director) located at Rd 4, Ashburton postcode 7774.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 35.71 per cent shares (exactly 5000 shares) and includes
Mcnab, Anthony James Hugh - located at Rd 4, Ashburton.
Previous addresses
Address: 255 Havelock Street, Ashburton, 7700 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 04 Dec 2013 to 11 Mar 2016
Address: 234-244 Havelock Street, Ashburton, Ashburton, 7700 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Sep 2012 to 04 Dec 2013
Address: 201-213 West Street, Ashburton, Ashburton, 7700 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 29 Oct 2010 to 11 Sep 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 14000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 26 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 9000 | |||
Director | Mcnab, Anthony James Hugh |
Rd 4 Ashburton 7774 New Zealand |
29 Oct 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Mcnab, Anthony James Hugh |
Rd 4 Ashburton 7774 New Zealand |
29 Oct 2010 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mcnab, Patricia Frances Frances |
Rd 4 Ashburton 7774 New Zealand |
03 Nov 2010 - 29 Sep 2011 |
Individual | Mcnab, Maureen Ann |
Rd 4 Ashburton 7774 New Zealand |
03 Nov 2010 - 29 Sep 2011 |
Individual | Mcnab, Hugh James |
Rd 4 Ashburton 7774 New Zealand |
29 Oct 2010 - 14 Jul 2017 |
Anthony James Hugh Mcnab - Director
Appointment date: 29 Oct 2010
Address: Rd 4, Ashburton, 7774 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Oct 2010
Broadfields Farm (ash) Limited
151 Burnett Street
Keen Energy Limited
151 Burnett Street
Ye Holdings Limited
151 Burnett Street
Andrew Currie Limited
151 Burnett Street
Jagardik Lamborn Limited
151 Burnett Street
Perfect Polish Limited
151 Burnett Street