Greenfield Clovelly Trustee Limited was started on 22 Dec 2010 and issued an NZBN of 9429031267328. This registered LTD company has been managed by 4 directors: Aaron James Wallace - an active director whose contract started on 22 Dec 2010,
Matthew Graeme Bellingham - an active director whose contract started on 22 Dec 2010,
Luke Arthur Van Den Hurk - an inactive director whose contract started on 22 Dec 2010 and was terminated on 14 Jun 2012,
Rowan Nigel Wilde - an inactive director whose contract started on 22 Dec 2010 and was terminated on 14 Jun 2012.
According to our information (updated on 26 Aug 2024), this company uses 1 address: 470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (category: registered, physical).
Until 21 Mar 2013, Greenfield Clovelly Trustee Limited had been using 470 Parnell Road, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Greenfield, Bruce Stephen (an individual) located at Bucklands Beach, Manukau postcode 2012.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Greenfield, Sandra May - located at Bucklands Beach, Manukau.
Previous address
Address: 470 Parnell Road, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 22 Dec 2010 to 21 Mar 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 19 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Greenfield, Bruce Stephen |
Bucklands Beach Manukau 2012 New Zealand |
22 Dec 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Greenfield, Sandra May |
Bucklands Beach Manukau 2012 New Zealand |
22 Dec 2010 - |
Aaron James Wallace - Director
Appointment date: 22 Dec 2010
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Dec 2015
Matthew Graeme Bellingham - Director
Appointment date: 22 Dec 2010
Address: Rd 3, Albany, 0793 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Dec 2010
Address: Riverhead, 0793 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Nov 2019
Luke Arthur Van Den Hurk - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Dec 2010
Termination date: 14 Jun 2012
Address: Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Dec 2010
Rowan Nigel Wilde - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Dec 2010
Termination date: 14 Jun 2012
Address: Orakei, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Dec 2010
Farrah Breads Limited
470 Parnell Road
Weston Mcdonald Trustee Limited
470 Parnell Road
The House Company Limited
470 Parnell Road
Takutai Trustee Limited
470 Parnell Road
Hicks Family Trustees Limited
470 Parnell Road
Leo Peng Trustee Limited
470 Parnell Road