Simkenz Limited was registered on 09 Feb 2011 and issued an NZBN of 9429031225922. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Mandy Mae Kavanagh-Vincent - an active director whose contract started on 09 Feb 2011,
Graham Neil Vincent - an active director whose contract started on 09 Feb 2011.
According to BizDb's information (last updated on 23 Jul 2024), this company filed 1 address: 10 Mccrystal Avenue, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 (type: physical, registered).
Until 01 Nov 2018, Simkenz Limited had been using Colmar Road, Mellons Bay, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Vincent, Graham Neil (a director) located at Bucklands Beach, Auckland postcode 2012.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Kavanagh-Vincent, Mandy Mae - located at Mellons Bay, Manukau. Simkenz Limited is categorised as "Counselling service nec" (business classification Q879025).
Principal place of activity
10 Mccrystal Avenue, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: Colmar Road, Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Jun 2014 to 01 Nov 2018
Address: 10 Colmar Road, Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Jun 2014 to 06 Jun 2014
Address: 69 Ridge Road, Howick, Manukau, 2014 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 Feb 2011 to 05 Jun 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 28 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Vincent, Graham Neil |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
09 Feb 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Kavanagh-vincent, Mandy Mae |
Mellons Bay Manukau 2014 New Zealand |
09 Feb 2011 - |
Mandy Mae Kavanagh-vincent - Director
Appointment date: 09 Feb 2011
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Oct 2018
Address: Mellons Bay, Manukau, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Feb 2011
Graham Neil Vincent - Director
Appointment date: 09 Feb 2011
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Oct 2018
Address: Mellons Bay, Manukau, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Feb 2011
Patio Limited
14 Colmar Road
Chinese Cancer Support Society Incorporated
14 Colmar Road
House Of Aesthetics Limited
4 Colmar Road
Bugnegne Limited
18 Colmar Road
Kang Lai Company Limited
15 Colmar Road
Argosy Trustee Limited
1 Page Point
Better Outcomes Now Limited
3a Kentville Place
Community Counselling Limited
83 The Parade
Limina Co Limited
176 Cook Street
Mindfulness Matters Limited
61 Bleakhouse Road
Spiritual Counselling Juergen Arndt Limited
12 Colmar Road
Sue Beresford Limited
Suite 1, 159 Botany Road