Eco Rakau Limited, a registered company, was launched on 14 Feb 2011. 9429031217149 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Forestry ownership or management (excluding field operations)" (business classification M696235) is how the company has been categorised. This company has been managed by 3 directors: Roderick Noel Scott - an active director whose contract started on 14 Mar 2016,
Jeremy Roderick Scott - an inactive director whose contract started on 24 Jun 2013 and was terminated on 14 Mar 2016,
Roderick Noel Scott - an inactive director whose contract started on 14 Feb 2011 and was terminated on 21 Jun 2013.
Last updated on 30 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 792 Oropi Road, Rd 3, Oropi, 3173 (type: physical, service).
Eco Rakau Limited had been using 796 Oropi Road, Rd 3, Tauranga as their physical address up until 06 Aug 2019.
All company shares (100 shares exactly) are owned by a single group consisting of 2 entities, namely:
Scott, Roderick Noel (a director) located at Rd 3, Tauranga postcode 3173,
Scott, Wendy Ethel (an individual) located at Rd 3, Tauranga postcode 3173.
Principal place of activity
792 Oropi Road, Rd 3, Tauranga, 3173 New Zealand
Previous address
Address: 796 Oropi Road, Rd 3, Tauranga, 3173 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 14 Feb 2011 to 06 Aug 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 02 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Scott, Roderick Noel |
Rd 3 Tauranga 3173 New Zealand |
14 Mar 2016 - |
Individual | Scott, Wendy Ethel |
Rd 3 Tauranga 3173 New Zealand |
16 Mar 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Scott, Wendy Ethel |
Rd 3 Tauranga 3173 New Zealand |
14 Feb 2011 - 28 Jun 2013 |
Individual | Scott, Roderick Noel |
Rd 3 Tauranga 3173 New Zealand |
14 Feb 2011 - 28 Jun 2013 |
Individual | Scott, Jeremy Roderick |
Tauranga 3173 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2013 - 14 Mar 2016 |
Director | Jeremy Roderick Scott |
Tauranga 3173 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2013 - 14 Mar 2016 |
Director | Roderick Noel Scott |
Rd 3 Tauranga 3173 New Zealand |
14 Feb 2011 - 28 Jun 2013 |
Roderick Noel Scott - Director
Appointment date: 14 Mar 2016
Address: Rd 3, Tauranga, 3173 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Mar 2016
Jeremy Roderick Scott - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jun 2013
Termination date: 14 Mar 2016
Address: Tauranga, 3173 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jun 2013
Roderick Noel Scott - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Feb 2011
Termination date: 21 Jun 2013
Address: Rd 3, Tauranga, 3173 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Feb 2011
Sustainable Resources Limited
796 Oropi Road
Eastwood Nz Limited
792 Oropi Road
Scott Logging Limited
792 Oropi Road
Eco Rakau Nz Limited
792 Oropi Road
Tuawhenua Helicopters Limited
792 Oropi Road
Forest Holdings Limited
792 Oropi Road
B Rust Consulting Limited
42 St Andrews Drive
Forestate Nz Management Limited
Wood Walton Chartered Accountants Ltd
Otpp New Zealand Forest Investments Limited
Unit 5, 120 Hamilton Street
Pine Holdings Limited
36 Cameron Road
Scobra Investments Limited
95 Mortlake Heights
Tiaki Plantations Company
Unit 5, 120 Hamilton Street