Jamie's Hair Design Limited was incorporated on 21 Mar 2011 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031182768. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Matthew Lawrence Hepper - an active director whose contract started on 21 Mar 2011,
Jamie Anne Hepper - an active director whose contract started on 21 Mar 2011.
As stated in our data (last updated on 08 Sep 2024), this company uses 1 address: 196 Carrington Road, Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 (types include: registered, physical).
Up until 01 Oct 2020, Jamie's Hair Design Limited had been using 109 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Hepper, Matthew Lawrence (a director) located at Rd 2, Helensville postcode 0875.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Hepper, Jamie Anne - located at Rd 2, Helensville. Jamie's Hair Design Limited has been categorised as "Hairdressing service" (business classification S951130).
Previous addresses
Address: 109 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 Oct 2019 to 01 Oct 2020
Address: 109 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 09 Oct 2017 to 08 Oct 2019
Address: 40 Taharoto Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Registered address used from 04 Oct 2012 to 09 Oct 2017
Address: 18 Randal Place, Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Physical address used from 04 Oct 2012 to 09 Oct 2017
Address: 18 Randal Place, Bayview, North Shore City, 0629 New Zealand
Physical address used from 21 Mar 2011 to 04 Oct 2012
Address: 40 Taharoto Road, Takapuna, North Shore City, 0622 New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Mar 2011 to 04 Oct 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 28 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Hepper, Matthew Lawrence |
Rd 2 Helensville 0875 New Zealand |
21 Mar 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Hepper, Jamie Anne |
Rd 2 Helensville 0875 New Zealand |
21 Mar 2011 - |
Matthew Lawrence Hepper - Director
Appointment date: 21 Mar 2011
Address: Rd 2, Helensville, 0875 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2017
Address: Bayview, North Shore City, 0629 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Mar 2011
Jamie Anne Hepper - Director
Appointment date: 21 Mar 2011
Address: Rd 2, Helensville, 0875 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2017
Address: Bayview, North Shore City, 0629 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Mar 2011
T & L Uhlenberg Trustee Limited
109 Powderham Street
Gordon Monmouth Trustee Company Limited
109-113 Powderham Street
Rbs Invest Limited
109 Powderham Street
Kotuku (2012) Limited
2nd Floor, Staples Rodway Bldg
I & N Butler Nominees Limited
109-113 Powderham Street
Soil And Plant Health Limited
109 Powderham Street
Image 101 Limited
B D O Taranaki Limited
Jack Old No 7 Limited
182 St Aubyn Street
Pattersons Limited
109 Powderham Street
The Cutting Edge (2007) Limited
56 Devon Street East
Wild Flowers Limited
93-95 Devon Street West
Z.a.m.m Holdings Limited
Young Carrington Shera