Flying Braid Limited was incorporated on 21 Mar 2011 and issued an NZBN of 9429031176149. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Sheryl Dawn Howarth - an active director whose contract began on 21 Mar 2011,
Sheryl Dawn Van Biljon - an active director whose contract began on 21 Mar 2011.
According to our information (last updated on 29 Jul 2024), the company filed 1 address: 4A Te Kea Place, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (types include: registered, physical).
Up to 15 Feb 2018, Flying Braid Limited had been using 3A Rothwell Avenue, Rosedale, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (3 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 99 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Howarth, Sheryl Dawn (an individual) located at Browns Bay, Auckland postcode 0630,
Skbf Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Albany, Auckland postcode 0632.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 1% shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Howarth, Sheryl Dawn - located at Browns Bay, Auckland. Flying Braid Limited was categorised as "Clinic - medical - general practice" (business classification Q851110).
Previous addresses
Address: 3a Rothwell Avenue, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Aug 2012 to 15 Feb 2018
Address: Unit 6/43 Omega Street, North Harbour, North Shore City, 0931 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 21 Mar 2011 to 16 Aug 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 31 Jan 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | Howarth, Sheryl Dawn |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
05 Dec 2023 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Skbf Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429043411160 |
Albany Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
09 Nov 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Howarth, Sheryl Dawn |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
05 Dec 2023 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Van Biljon, Sheryl Dawn |
Browns Bay North Shore City 0630 New Zealand |
21 Mar 2011 - 05 Dec 2023 |
Director | Van Biljon, Sheryl Dawn |
Browns Bay North Shore City 0630 New Zealand |
21 Mar 2011 - 05 Dec 2023 |
Director | Van Biljon, Sheryl Dawn |
Browns Bay North Shore City 0630 New Zealand |
21 Mar 2011 - 05 Dec 2023 |
Entity | Wyndham Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037014643 Company Number: 1114468 |
21 Mar 2011 - 09 Nov 2016 | |
Entity | Wyndham Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037014643 Company Number: 1114468 |
21 Mar 2011 - 09 Nov 2016 |
Sheryl Dawn Howarth - Director
Appointment date: 21 Mar 2011
Address: Browns Bay, North Shore City, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Mar 2011
Sheryl Dawn Van Biljon - Director
Appointment date: 21 Mar 2011
Address: Browns Bay, North Shore City, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Mar 2011
Glover Homes Limited
4a Te Kea Place
The Style Insider Limited
4a Te Kea Place
Scottie T Photography Limited
4a Te Kea Place
Carruthers Consulting Limited
4a Te Kea Place
Browns Bay Family Doctors (2011) Limited
4a Te Kea Place
Sw Hall Limited
4a Te Kea Place
Manly Medical West Limited
Building 3 106 Bush Rd
Mayfield Medical Resources Limited
Flat 3, 106l Bush Road
Northcare Accident & Medical Limited
110 Unsworth Drive
Sw Hall Limited
4a Te Kea Place
Takapuna Medical Centre Limited
110 Unsworth Drive
Te Atatu Health Limited
27c William Pickering Drive