Intoto Projects Limited was launched on 01 Apr 2011 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031164375. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Lawrence Cecil Gabites - an active director whose contract began on 01 Apr 2011,
Jennifer May Harris - an active director whose contract began on 01 Apr 2011.
According to BizDb's data (last updated on 17 Sep 2024), the company uses 1 address: 23 Wallace Street, Motueka, Motueka, 7120 (category: registered, physical).
Up to 11 Oct 2021, Intoto Projects Limited had been using 23 Wallace Street, Motueka, Motueka as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Gabites, Lawrence Cecil (a director) located at Richmond, Richmond postcode 7020.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Harris, Jennifer May - located at Richmond, Richmond. Intoto Projects Limited has been categorised as "Management consultancy service" (business classification M696245).
Previous addresses
Address: 23 Wallace Street, Motueka, Motueka, 7120 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 25 Oct 2017 to 11 Oct 2021
Address: 23 Wallace Street, Motueka, Motueka, 7120 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 Oct 2016 to 25 Oct 2017
Address: 23 Wallace Street, Motueka, 7120 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Apr 2011 to 20 Oct 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 30 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Gabites, Lawrence Cecil |
Richmond Richmond 7020 New Zealand |
01 Apr 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Harris, Jennifer May |
Richmond Richmond 7020 New Zealand |
01 Apr 2011 - |
Lawrence Cecil Gabites - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2011
Address: Richmond, Richmond, 7020 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Oct 2017
Address: Rd 1, Upper Moutere, 7173 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2015
Jennifer May Harris - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2011
Address: Richmond, Richmond, 7020 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Oct 2017
Address: Rd 1, Upper Moutere, 7173 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2015
Mickar Holdings Limited
23 Wallace Street
Ponty's Place Limited
23 Wallace Street
Smart Business Centre Motueka Limited
23 Wallace Street
Tasman Bays Promotions Association Incorporated
C/-motueka Visitor Information Centre
Motueka Events Charitable Trust
20 Wallace Street
Weingut Seifried Limited
29 Wallace Street
Blissful Mind Limited
151 Horton Road
Delafield Services Limited
195 Kina Peninsula Road
Heritage Consulting Limited
27 Pinehill Road
Hospitalitydept. Limited
239 Motueka Valley Highway
Ping Insights Limited
7 Trewavas Street
Zoenergy Limited
197 Kina Peninsula Road