Slumber Beds Limited, a registered company, was started on 01 Jun 2011. 9429031074667 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Bed retailing" (ANZSIC G421130) is how the company is categorised. The company has been run by 3 directors: Francis Chai - an active director whose contract began on 01 Jun 2011,
Helene Chai - an active director whose contract began on 01 Jun 2011,
Fiona Margaret Christina Thornton - an active director whose contract began on 07 Jun 2011.
Updated on 28 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 9 Maui Street, Pukete, Hamilton, 3200 (type: office, registered).
Slumber Beds Limited had been using 9 Maui Street, Pukete, Hamilton as their service address up to 10 May 2024.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 500 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 500 shares (50%).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 8 Clomell Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Shareregister address used from 02 May 2024
Address #5: 9 Tennille Street, Flagstaff, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 10 May 2024
Principal place of activity
9 Maui Street, Pukete, Hamilton, 3200 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 9 Maui Street, Pukete, Hamilton, 3200 New Zealand
Service address used from 19 Mar 2013 to 10 May 2024
Address #2: Suite 2, 451 Ti Rakau Drive, Golflands, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Physical address used from 21 Sep 2011 to 19 Mar 2013
Address #3: 9 Maui Street, Pukete, Hamilton, 3200 New Zealand
Physical address used from 27 Jul 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
Address #4: 9 Maui Street, Pukete, Hamilton, 3200 New Zealand
Registered address used from 27 Jul 2011 to 10 May 2024
Address #5: 8 Clomell Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 01 Jun 2011 to 27 Jul 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 02 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Farri New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038743061 |
Toplands Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
01 Jun 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Dontae Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032738155 |
Flagstaff Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
07 Mar 2012 - |
Ultimate Holding Company
Francis Chai - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jun 2011
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2011
Helene Chai - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jun 2011
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Fiona Margaret Christina Thornton - Director
Appointment date: 07 Jun 2011
Address: Flagstaff, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Mar 2014
Greens Global Ip Limited
22 The Boulevard
Select Homes Limited
24 The Boulevard
Aixnz Group Limited
26 Tawn Place
Asset Resources Limited
15 The Boulevard
A & S Trustees Limited
15 The Boulevard
Advance Fitness (distribution) Limited
15 The Boulevard
Bedstop Kerikeri Limited
33 Coles Crescent
Bedstop Whangarei Limited
33 Coles Crescent
Lzt Limited
32 Borman Road
Pontarama Limited
Level3, Pwc Centre
Sleep Mode New Zealand Limited
21 Puriri Street
Wanson Trading Limited
4 Cranmore Avenue