Auckland Insurance (2011) Limited was launched on 01 Jun 2011 and issued a number of 9429031073288. This registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: David William Ernest Burroughs - an active director whose contract began on 27 Jan 2017,
Christine Mary Kerr - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Nov 2015 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2022,
Roy Harvey Kerr - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Jun 2011 and was terminated on 01 Dec 2015.
As stated in BizDb's database (updated on 02 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: Po Box 17197, Greenlane, Auckland, 1546 (types include: postal, delivery).
Up until 13 Sep 2016, Auckland Insurance (2011) Limited had been using 68 Gowing Drive, Meadowbank, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 1000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Long Burroughs Limited (an entity) located at Ellerslie, Auckland postcode 1051. Auckland Insurance (2011) Limited is classified as "Insurance broking service" (ANZSIC K642040).
Principal place of activity
Level 1 347 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 68 Gowing Drive, Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 01 Jun 2011 to 13 Sep 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 07 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Long Burroughs Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041755365 |
Ellerslie Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
01 Dec 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Tournier, Brian Lawrence |
Bayview Auckland 0629 New Zealand |
18 Feb 2015 - 25 Oct 2016 |
Individual | Hollies, Joanne Clare |
Meadowbank Auckland 1072 New Zealand |
01 Jun 2011 - 15 Apr 2022 |
Individual | Kerr, Christine Mary |
Meadowbank Auckland 1072 New Zealand |
01 Jun 2011 - 15 Apr 2022 |
Individual | Kerr, Christine Mary |
Meadowbank Auckland 1072 New Zealand |
01 Jun 2011 - 15 Apr 2022 |
Entity | Long Burroughs Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041755365 Company Number: 5702227 |
01 Dec 2016 - 01 Dec 2016 | |
Director | Roy Harvey Kerr |
Meadowbank Auckland 1072 New Zealand |
01 Jun 2011 - 03 May 2016 |
Entity | Long Burroughs Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041755365 Company Number: 5702227 |
01 Dec 2016 - 01 Dec 2016 | |
Individual | Kerr, Roy Harvey |
Meadowbank Auckland 1072 New Zealand |
01 Jun 2011 - 03 May 2016 |
David William Ernest Burroughs - Director
Appointment date: 27 Jan 2017
Address: Glen Innes, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Jan 2017
Christine Mary Kerr - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2015
Termination date: 01 Apr 2022
Address: Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2015
Roy Harvey Kerr - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jun 2011
Termination date: 01 Dec 2015
Address: Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2011
The Fusion Group Limited
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace
Crp & Njp Investments Limited
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace
Tfa Crp & Njp Trustee Limited
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace
Reflection Treatment Systems Limited
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace
Ledlight Limited
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace
Tfa Coulthard Miller Trustee Limited
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace
Donaldson Brown Auckland Limited
235 Parnell Rd
Insurance Advisernet New Zealand Limited
Level 1, 235 Parnell Road
Integrity Insurance Limited
Suite 1, Level 3, 20 Augustus Terrace
It's All Sorted Limited
3/1 Faraday Street
Mri Holdings Limited
Level 1, 1 Faraday Street
Super City Insurance Limited
Level 3, 272 Parnell Road