New Lucky Star Restaurant Limited, a registered company, was launched on 07 Jun 2011. 9429031071109 is the NZBN it was issued. "Restaurant operation" (ANZSIC H451130) is how the company is categorised. This company has been managed by 4 directors: Yue Shuang Huang - an active director whose contract began on 12 Sep 2022,
Grace Siuman Lai - an active director whose contract began on 12 Sep 2022,
Tony Ping Kwan Kwok - an inactive director whose contract began on 07 Jun 2011 and was terminated on 12 Sep 2022,
Yam Ching Wong - an inactive director whose contract began on 07 Jun 2011 and was terminated on 12 Sep 2022.
Updated on 17 Sep 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 125 Great South Road, Papatoetoe, Auckland, 2025 (types include: postal, physical).
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (3 groups). The first group is comprised of 200 shares (20 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 2 shareholders in control of 450 shares (45 per cent). Lastly there is the 3rd share allotment (350 shares 35 per cent) made up of 2 entities.
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 04 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 200 | |||
Individual | Lam, Cho Yam |
Somerville Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
17 Oct 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 450 | |||
Individual | Wong, Yam Ching |
Three Kings Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
07 Jun 2011 - |
Director | Yam Ching Wong |
Three Kings Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
07 Jun 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 350 | |||
Individual | Kwok, Tony Ping Kwan |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
07 Jun 2011 - |
Director | Tony Ping Kwan Kwok |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
07 Jun 2011 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Huang, Qi Ji |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
07 Jun 2011 - 17 Oct 2014 |
Entity | Lan He Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041423844 Company Number: 5470311 |
17 Oct 2014 - 11 May 2015 | |
Entity | Lan He Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041423844 Company Number: 5470311 |
17 Oct 2014 - 11 May 2015 |
Yue Shuang Huang - Director
Appointment date: 12 Sep 2022
Address: Three Kings, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Sep 2022
Grace Siuman Lai - Director
Appointment date: 12 Sep 2022
Address: Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Sep 2022
Tony Ping Kwan Kwok - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Jun 2011
Termination date: 12 Sep 2022
Address: Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Jun 2011
Yam Ching Wong - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Jun 2011
Termination date: 12 Sep 2022
Address: Three Kings, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Oct 2014
Top Image Hair & Beauty Limited
10 Eric Baker Place
Roop Shingaar Jewellers Limited
10 East Tamaki Road
Ls Grooming Services Limited
22 Eric Baker Place
Ms Property Rentals Limited
Flat 13, 289 Shirley Road
Pizzamilano's Limited
154 Great South Road
New Luther Jewellers Limited
158 Great South Road
Akaal Limited
39 Hoteo Avenue
Arshpreet Limited
Suite 1, 131 Kolmar Road
Bindra And Grandson Limited
47a Great South Road
Portofino Hamilton Limited
1/131 Kolmar Road
Portofino Howick Limited
Suite 1, 131 Kolmar Road
Portofino Mission Bay Limited
1/131 Kolmar Road