Number 8 Trustee Services Limited was started on 13 Jun 2011 and issued a number of 9429031061445. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 1 director, named Matthew Glen Gordon - an active director whose contract started on 13 Jun 2011.
According to our database (last updated on 07 Aug 2024), this company registered 4 addresses: 16 Bealey Avenue, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 (physical address),
16 Bealey Avenue, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 (service address),
16 Bealey Avenue, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 (registered address),
Box 20339, Bishopdale, Christchurch, 8543 (postal address) among others.
Up until 13 Jul 2020, Number 8 Trustee Services Limited had been using 3/250 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Gordon, Matthew Glen (a director) located at Merivale, Christchurch postcode 8014.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 16 Bealey Avenue, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Physical & service address used from 15 Jul 2022
Principal place of activity
16 Bealey Avenue, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 3/250 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 Jul 2016 to 13 Jul 2020
Address #2: 3/250 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Physical address used from 12 Jul 2016 to 15 Jul 2022
Address #3: 2/77 Tuam Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Jul 2014 to 12 Jul 2016
Address #4: Level 2, 149 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 11 Jul 2012 to 10 Jul 2014
Address #5: 79 Kilmore Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 Jun 2011 to 11 Jul 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 01 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Gordon, Matthew Glen |
Merivale Christchurch 8014 New Zealand |
13 Jun 2011 - |
Matthew Glen Gordon - Director
Appointment date: 13 Jun 2011
Address: Strowan, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Jul 2020
Address: Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Jul 2016
Address: Papanui, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Jul 2019
Onlandscapes Limited
Flat 1, 250 St Asaph Street
Pc Investments (2007) Limited
Flat 1, 250 St Asaph Street
Quigley Developments Limited
250 St Asaph Street
Costelloe Holdings Limited
Flat 1, 250 St Asaph Street
Julian Equities Limited
Flat 1, 250 St Asaph Street
Kinshasha Trustees Limited
1/250 St Asaph Street