Movie Trailers Limited, a removed company, was registered on 01 Jul 2011. 9429031034203 is the NZBN it was issued. "Fast food retailing" (ANZSIC H451220) is how the company has been classified. This company has been run by 3 directors: Weier Zou - an active director whose contract began on 06 Jul 2012,
Gaynor Gemmill - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 Aug 2013 and was terminated on 14 Oct 2014,
Ying Nan Mao - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Jul 2011 and was terminated on 06 Jul 2012.
Updated on 16 Mar 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 3 Tompkins Lane, Burwood, Christchurch, 8061 (category: registered, physical).
Movie Trailers Limited had been using 3 Tompkins Lane, Burnwood, Christchurch as their registered address up to 12 Feb 2019.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Zou, Weier - located at 8061, Burwood, Christchurch.
Principal place of activity
Shop 16, 120 Hereford Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 3 Tompkins Lane, Burnwood, Christchurch, 8061 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Nov 2018 to 12 Feb 2019
Address: 31 Kotuku Crescent, Woolston, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Apr 2017 to 05 Nov 2018
Address: Unit 4, 5 Rolleston Shopping Centre, Rolleston, Christchurch, 7614 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 Aug 2012 to 12 Apr 2017
Address: 22 Bibiana Street, Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Aug 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 04 Feb 2019
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Zou, Weier |
Burwood Christchurch 8061 New Zealand |
01 Feb 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mao, Ying Nan |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
01 Jul 2011 - 03 Aug 2012 |
Director | Ying Nan Mao |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
01 Jul 2011 - 03 Aug 2012 |
Weier Zou - Director
Appointment date: 06 Jul 2012
Address: Burwood, Christchurch, 8061 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Feb 2019
Address: Woolston, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Apr 2017
Gaynor Gemmill - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Aug 2013
Termination date: 14 Oct 2014
Address: Rolleston, Rolleston, 7614 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Aug 2013
Ying Nan Mao - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2011
Termination date: 06 Jul 2012
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2011
Evolution Sports Coaching Limited
67 Kotuku Crescent
Jaloe Trading Company Limited
17 Charlesworth Street
Heavenly Horizons Limited
17 Charlesworth Street
Heavenly Horizons Charitable Trust
17 Charlesworth St
The Green Effect Trust
42 Charlesworth St
Bay Harbour Painters Limited
881 Ferry Road
Angry Red Lunchbar 2016 Limited
65 Garlands Road
Famous Peppers Limited
12a Walpole Street
Go Gemini Limited
235a Linwood Avenue
J.a.investments Limited
Flat 2, 30 Mathesons Road
Le Poisson En Chocolat Limited
30 Tabart Street
S & H Riccarton Limited
6 Lancaster Street