Allen Chambers Limited was incorporated on 06 Oct 2011 and issued an NZ business number of 9429030922044. The registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Annalisa Martin Chambers - an active director whose contract began on 16 Dec 2019,
George Allen Chambers - an active director whose contract began on 29 Jun 2020,
George Allen Chambers - an inactive director whose contract began on 06 Oct 2011 and was terminated on 16 Dec 2019.
According to our database (last updated on 28 Jul 2024), this company filed 1 address: 42 Rutherford Street, Nelson, 7010 (type: postal, office).
Until 10 Dec 2012, Allen Chambers Limited had been using 23A Stansell Avenue, Tahunanui, Nelson as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Chambers, Annalisa Martin (a director) located at Tahunanui, Nelson postcode 7011.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 99 per cent shares (exactly 99 shares) and includes
Chambers, George Allen - located at Tahunanui, Nelson.
Principal place of activity
42 Rutherford Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 23a Stansell Avenue, Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Oct 2011 to 10 Dec 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 11 Jan 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Chambers, Annalisa Martin |
Tahunanui Nelson 7011 New Zealand |
28 Sep 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | Chambers, George Allen |
Tahunanui Nelson 7011 New Zealand |
06 Oct 2011 - |
Annalisa Martin Chambers - Director
Appointment date: 16 Dec 2019
Address: Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Dec 2019
George Allen Chambers - Director
Appointment date: 29 Jun 2020
Address: Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jun 2020
George Allen Chambers - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Oct 2011
Termination date: 16 Dec 2019
Address: Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2018
Address: Nelson, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Nov 2014
Graeme Lowans Charitable Trust
51 Rutherford Street
Bhutanese Society Of Nelson New Zealand Incorporated
2 Bridge Street
Multicultural Nelson Tasman Incorporated
4 Bridge Street
Waddington Enterprises Limited
14b Vanguard Street
2 Step Holdings Limited
60 Rutherford Street
Te Ramaroa Trust
3 Haven Road