Wells Trustee Company No.1 Limited was started on 30 Nov 2011 and issued an NZBN of 9429030864863. The registered LTD company has been run by 4 directors: Alison Jeannie Tait - an active director whose contract began on 30 Nov 2011,
John Mark Trevelyan Wells - an active director whose contract began on 30 Nov 2011,
Stephen Kenneth Wood - an active director whose contract began on 30 Nov 2011,
Alan Graham Rowe - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Nov 2011 and was terminated on 30 Jun 2023.
According to our information (last updated on 18 Jul 2024), this company registered 1 address: 419 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 (types include: physical, registered).
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (3 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 3 entities, namely:
Tait, Alison Jeannie (a director) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050,
Wells, John Mark Trevelyan (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050,
Wood, Stephen Kenneth (a director) located at Lynfield, Auckland postcode 1042.
Principal place of activity
419 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 06 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Tait, Alison Jeannie |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
30 Nov 2011 - |
Individual | Wells, John Mark Trevelyan |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
30 Nov 2011 - |
Director | Wood, Stephen Kenneth |
Lynfield Auckland 1042 New Zealand |
30 Nov 2011 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Rowe, Alan Graham |
Bethels Road Auckland Rd2 New Zealand |
30 Nov 2011 - 11 Oct 2023 |
Alison Jeannie Tait - Director
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2011
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2011
John Mark Trevelyan Wells - Director
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2011
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Dec 2020
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Stephen Kenneth Wood - Director
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2011
Address: Lynfield, Auckland, 1042 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jun 2020
Address: Panmure, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jun 2014
Alan Graham Rowe - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2011
Termination date: 30 Jun 2023
Address: Bethels Road, Auckland, Rd2 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2011
The Ashton Trust Company Limited
419 Remuera Road
Trevelyan Limited
419 Remuera Road
Wells & Co Lawyers Limited
419 Remuera Road
The Wild Bunch Limited
419 Remuera Road
Rotary Club Of Newmarket Incorporated
C/- Wells & Co
Wilson Mckay Trustee Company (204471) Limited
1a St Vincent Avenue