Indus Mortgages Limited was registered on 17 Feb 2012 and issued a business number of 9429030786202. The registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Soumya Shine - an active director whose contract began on 28 Apr 2022,
Biju Ambika Surendran - an inactive director whose contract began on 17 Feb 2012 and was terminated on 28 Apr 2022.
As stated in BizDb's information (last updated on 21 Mar 2024), the company uses 1 address: 1181 Dominion Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 (types include: registered, physical).
Up to 06 May 2022, Indus Mortgages Limited had been using 844 Dominion Road, Mount Eden, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb found other names used by the company: from 16 Feb 2012 to 15 Dec 2020 they were named Kera Holdings Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Retnamma, Rekha Sivan (an individual) located at Mount Roskill, Auckland postcode 1041. Indus Mortgages Limited has been classified as "Mortgage broking service" (business classification K641930).
Previous addresses
Address: 844 Dominion Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1041 New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 Jan 2015 to 06 May 2022
Address: 844 Dominion Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1041 New Zealand
Physical address used from 07 Feb 2014 to 06 May 2022
Address: 413 Richardson Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 New Zealand
Physical address used from 17 Feb 2012 to 07 Feb 2014
Address: 413 Richardson Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 New Zealand
Registered address used from 17 Feb 2012 to 06 Jan 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 09 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Retnamma, Rekha Sivan |
Mount Roskill Auckland 1041 New Zealand |
28 Apr 2022 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Surendran, Biju Ambika |
Mount Roskill Auckland 1041 New Zealand |
17 Feb 2012 - 28 Apr 2022 |
Individual | Narayanan, Rajani Dinesh |
Greenlane Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
02 Aug 2012 - 17 Dec 2012 |
Soumya Shine - Director
Appointment date: 28 Apr 2022
Address: Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Apr 2022
Biju Ambika Surendran - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Feb 2012
Termination date: 28 Apr 2022
Address: Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Dec 2020
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1041 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Dec 2014
Rsg Holdings Limited
844 Dominion Road
Aarav Investments Limited
844 Dominion Road
Simpson Equipment Hire Limited
844 Dominion Road
Simpson Construction Limited
844 Dominion Road
Fragrance World Nz Limited
844 Dominion Road
Ho Corporate Trustee Limited
844 Dominion Road
Blue Sky International Trading Limited
26a Hazel Avenue
Clm Finance Limited
137 Peary Road
First Mortgage Investment Limited
50 Wembley Road
Mortgage Scene Limited
8 Telford Ave
On The Move Mortgages Limited
12b Invermay Avenue
Wise Mortgages Limited
Flat 2, 115b Landscape Road