Qq Homes Limited, a registered company, was launched on 05 Mar 2012. 9429030765528 is the business number it was issued. This company has been run by 1 director, named Tuo He - an active director whose contract started on 05 Mar 2012.
Last updated on 03 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 3 addresses the company registered, specifically: 1 Kaituhi Lane, Coatesville, 0793 (registered address),
8 Te Awa Place, Red Beach, Red Beach, 0932 (registered address),
8 Te Awa Place, Red Beach, Red Beach, 0932 (service address),
8 Te Awa Place, Red Beach, Auckland, 0932 (physical address) among others.
Qq Homes Limited had been using 8 Te Awa Place, Red Beach, Auckland as their service address up to 28 Feb 2023.
More names for the company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 02 Mar 2012 to 15 Apr 2016 they were called Nz Lifestyles Limited.
A total of 10000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 5100 shares (51 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 4900 shares (49 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 8 Te Awa Place, Red Beach, Auckland, 0932 New Zealand
Service address used from 09 Apr 2021 to 28 Feb 2023
Address #2: 198 Harris Drive, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Registered address used from 20 Jun 2017 to 28 Feb 2023
Address #3: 198 Harris Drive, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Physical address used from 20 Jun 2017 to 09 Apr 2021
Address #4: 198 Harrisdrive, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Physical address used from 27 Mar 2017 to 20 Jun 2017
Address #5: 11 Laura Jane Drive, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 Sep 2013 to 20 Jun 2017
Address #6: 11 Laura Jane Drive, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Physical address used from 06 Sep 2013 to 27 Mar 2017
Address #7: 11 Laura Jane Drive, Millwater, Auckland, 0993 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Mar 2012 to 06 Sep 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 04 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5100 | |||
Director | He, Tuo |
Coatesville 0793 New Zealand |
05 Mar 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 4900 | |||
Individual | Shang, Xiaoyu |
Coatesville 0793 New Zealand |
29 Aug 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Zhang, Xiuhua |
Silverdale Auckland 0992 New Zealand |
07 Aug 2018 - 14 Sep 2018 |
Individual | Fang, Shujun |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 New Zealand |
07 Aug 2018 - 14 Sep 2018 |
Tuo He - Director
Appointment date: 05 Mar 2012
Address: Coatesville, 0793 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Mar 2024
Address: Red Beach, Red Beach, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jun 2017
Address: Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jun 2017
New Zealand Golf Academy (2000) Limited
204 Harris Drive
To Love & To Serve Limited
198 Harris Drive
Harris Drive Limited
204 Harris Drive
Kingfisher Rd Limited
204 Harris Drive
Event Designers Limited
56 Harris Drive
Mci Investments Limited
32 Madison Terrace