Berlin Clothing Australia Limited was started on 08 May 2012 and issued a number of 9429030678095. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Thomas Samuel Halloran - an active director whose contract started on 08 May 2012,
Evan James Mcneill - an inactive director whose contract started on 08 May 2012 and was terminated on 23 Oct 2019.
According to our database (updated on 20 Aug 2024), the company filed 1 address: 1St Floor, 18 St Marks Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1051 (types include: registered, physical).
Up to 20 Sep 2018, Berlin Clothing Australia Limited had been using 1St Floor, 18 St Marks Road, Epsom, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 120 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 60 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Halloran, Thomas Samuel (a director) located at Henderson, Auckland postcode 0612.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 60 shares) and includes
Halloran, Gloria Piri - located at Henderson, Auckland. Berlin Clothing Australia Limited was classified as "Clothing wholesaling" (ANZSIC F371210).
Previous addresses
Address: 1st Floor, 18 St Marks Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 22 Jul 2015 to 20 Sep 2018
Address: 1st Floor, 470 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 Sep 2014 to 22 Jul 2015
Address: 1st Floor, 470 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Registered address used from 08 May 2012 to 22 Sep 2014
Address: 1st Floor, 470 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical address used from 08 May 2012 to 22 Jul 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 14 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 60 | |||
Director | Halloran, Thomas Samuel |
Henderson Auckland 0612 New Zealand |
08 May 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 60 | |||
Individual | Halloran, Gloria Piri |
Henderson Auckland 0612 New Zealand |
25 Nov 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mcneill, Evan James |
Half Moon Bay Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
08 May 2012 - 25 Nov 2019 |
Thomas Samuel Halloran - Director
Appointment date: 08 May 2012
Address: Henderson, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Address used since 08 May 2012
Evan James Mcneill - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 May 2012
Termination date: 23 Oct 2019
Address: Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 08 May 2012
Adrift Outdoor Education Limited
1/18 St Marks Rd
Kiwi Maintenance Group Limited
1st Floor
Berlin Clothing Co Limited
1st Floor
Tongariro Alpine Crossing Limited
L1, 18 St Marks Rd
East End Entertainment Limited
1st Floor
K W Carpets Limited
1st Floor
Awearness Corporate Promotions Limited
Level 3, 12 Kent Street
Clothing Journey New Zealand Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
East Side Clothing (nz) Limited
Level 2, 3 Margot Street
Etude Classique Limited
C/- James Bell & Co., Chartered
Jessica Bridal Limited
255 Broadway
The Bridal Distribution Limited
255 Broadway