Sandy Foots Limited, a registered company, was registered on 12 Sep 2012. 9429030515277 is the business number it was issued. "Car dealer - new and/or used (including associated vehicle servicing)" (ANZSIC G391110) is how the company was classified. This company has been run by 3 directors: Dale Ernest Sholson - an active director whose contract started on 12 Sep 2012,
Fleur Josephine Sholson - an active director whose contract started on 15 Sep 2015,
Darren Andrew Thompson - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 Sep 2012 and was terminated on 31 Jul 2015.
Updated on 06 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 5 addresses the company uses, specifically: 701 Port Road, Whangamata, Whangamata, 3620 (physical address),
701 Port Road, Whangamata, Whangamata, 3620 (service address),
Po Box 227, Pauanui Beach, Pauanui, 3546 (postal address),
3 Blucher Reef, Pauanui, Pauanui, 3579 (office address) among others.
Sandy Foots Limited had been using 7/701 Port Road, Whangamat as their physical address up to 11 May 2021.
Old names for the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 12 Sep 2012 to 14 Sep 2018 they were called The Kiwi Outdoor Oven Company Limited.
A total of 120 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 60 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 60 shares (50%).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 3 Blucher Reef, Pauanui, Pauanui, 3579 New Zealand
Office & delivery address used from 16 Aug 2020
Address #5: 701 Port Road, Whangamata, Whangamata, 3620 New Zealand
Physical & service address used from 11 May 2021
Principal place of activity
3 Blucher Reef, Pauanui, Pauanui, 3579 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 7/701 Port Road, Whangamat, 3620 New Zealand
Physical address used from 10 May 2021 to 11 May 2021
Address #2: 3 Blucher Reef, Pauanui, Pauanui, 3579 New Zealand
Physical address used from 02 Sep 2019 to 10 May 2021
Address #3: 701 Port Road, Whangamata, Whangamata, 3620 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Aug 2016 to 02 Sep 2019
Address #4: Chartered Accountants, 52 Commerce Street, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 21 Aug 2015 to 11 Aug 2016
Address #5: 52 Commerce Street, Whakatane, 3158 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Sep 2012 to 21 Aug 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 07 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 60 | |||
Director | Sholson, Fleur Josephine |
Pauanui Hikuai 3579 New Zealand |
23 Feb 2022 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 60 | |||
Director | Sholson, Dale Ernest |
Pauanui 3546 New Zealand |
12 Sep 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Darren Andrew Thompson |
Pauanui 3546 New Zealand |
12 Sep 2012 - 13 Aug 2015 |
Individual | Thompson, Darren Andrew |
Pauanui 3546 New Zealand |
12 Sep 2012 - 13 Aug 2015 |
Dale Ernest Sholson - Director
Appointment date: 12 Sep 2012
Address: Pauanui, Hikuai, 3579 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Aug 2016
Fleur Josephine Sholson - Director
Appointment date: 15 Sep 2015
Address: Pauanui, Hikuai, 3579 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Sep 2015
Darren Andrew Thompson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Sep 2012
Termination date: 31 Jul 2015
Address: Pauanui, 3546 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Sep 2012
Greatspace Homes Limited
7/701 Port Rd
Why Wait Limited
701 Port Road
Le Campanin Limited
705 Port Road
Slipper Store Limited
706 Port Road
R P Slater Limited
708 Port Road
Whanga Central Limited
601 Port Road
Centrepoint Motors Limited
Puke Road,
Ckr Holdings Limited
723 Pollen Street
Cooper Motors Nz Limited
1 Kennedy Street
K. O. Munro Limited
203 Walter Street
Kopu Classic Cars Limited
405 Mackay Street
Summit Motor Company Limited
46 Kenrick Street