Five Grain Limited was started on 12 Oct 2012 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030487468. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 5 directors: Aiden Kenealy - an active director whose contract started on 29 Feb 2024,
Simon Henis - an active director whose contract started on 29 Feb 2024,
Isabel Pasch - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 Oct 2012 and was terminated on 29 Feb 2024,
Shawn Lindsey Pope - an inactive director whose contract started on 28 Mar 2019 and was terminated on 24 Apr 2019,
Jens Dalhoff - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 Oct 2012 and was terminated on 28 Mar 2019.
According to our data (updated on 08 Sep 2024), the company uses 1 address: 3/34 Westmoreland Street West, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 (types include: registered, physical).
Up to 24 Mar 2021, Five Grain Limited had been using Level 3, 16 College Hill, Freemans Bay, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Crustum Limited (an entity) located at Grey Lynn, Auckland postcode 1021. Five Grain Limited has been classified as "Cafe operation" (ANZSIC H451110).
Previous addresses
Address: Level 3, 16 College Hill, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 Jul 2020 to 24 Mar 2021
Address: Level 3, 16 College Hill, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 06 Nov 2014 to 03 Jul 2020
Address: Level 1, 171 Hobson Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Oct 2012 to 06 Nov 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 28 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Crustum Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030487475 |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 New Zealand |
12 Oct 2012 - |
Ultimate Holding Company
Aiden Kenealy - Director
Appointment date: 29 Feb 2024
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Feb 2024
Simon Henis - Director
Appointment date: 29 Feb 2024
Address: Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Feb 2024
Isabel Pasch - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Oct 2012
Termination date: 29 Feb 2024
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Oct 2012
Shawn Lindsey Pope - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Mar 2019
Termination date: 24 Apr 2019
Address: Milford, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Mar 2019
Jens Dalhoff - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Oct 2012
Termination date: 28 Mar 2019
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2018
Address: Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2015
Atf Trustee (charlie) Limited
Level 1, 20 Beaumont Street
Atf Trustee (faray) Limited
Level 1, 20 Beaumont Street
Corrosion Control Engineering (nz) Limited
Level 3, 16 College Hill
West Terrace Limited
Level 3, 16 College Hill
Ihumatao Cleanfill Limited
Level 3, 16 College Hill
Atf Consultancy Limited
Level 1, 20 Beaumont Street
Brewed Intentions Limited
23 Franklin Road
Espresso Workshop Britomart Limited
Level 3, 16 College Hill
Foxtrot Limited
Level 3, 16 College Hill
Honey Limited
202 Ponsonby Road
Little Rocket Limited
16 College Hill
Swati Enterprises Limited
28 College Hill, Freemans Bay