Crowood Properties Limited was registered on 12 Nov 2012 and issued an NZBN of 9429030448933. This registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Mark Laurence Cromie - an active director whose contract started on 12 Nov 2012,
Bryce Rodney Woodward - an active director whose contract started on 12 Nov 2012.
As stated in our information (updated on 18 Aug 2024), this company registered 2 addresses: 67 Porowini Avenue, Whangarei, 0110 (physical address),
67 Porowini Avenue, Whangarei, 0110 (service address),
58 Otaika Road, Whangarei, 0110 (registered address).
Up until 06 Aug 2013, Crowood Properties Limited had been using 22 Carruth Street, Whangarei as their physical address.
A total of 200 shares are allotted to 2 groups (6 shareholders in total). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 3 entities, namely:
Woodward, Bryce Rodney (a director) located at Whau Valley, Whangarei postcode 0112,
Russell Turner Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Chartered Accountants, 58 Otaika Road, Whangarei 0110,
Woodward, Philippa Maureen Dobree (an individual) located at Whau Valley, Whangarei postcode 0112.
The 2nd group consists of 3 shareholders, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 100 shares) and includes
Tw Trustees 2011 Limited - located at Whangarei,
Cromie, Sheryl Noeline - located at Kamo, Whangare,
Cromie, Mark Laurence - located at Kamo, Whangarei. Crowood Properties Limited has been classified as "Investment - commercial property" (ANZSIC L671230).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 22 Carruth Street, Whangarei, 0110 New Zealand
Physical address used from 09 Jan 2013 to 06 Aug 2013
Address #2: Russell Turner, Chartered Accountants, 58 Otaika Road, Whangarei, 0110 New Zealand
Physical address used from 12 Nov 2012 to 09 Jan 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 200
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 04 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Woodward, Bryce Rodney |
Whau Valley Whangarei 0112 New Zealand |
12 Nov 2012 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Russell Turner Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036348664 |
Chartered Accountants 58 Otaika Road, Whangarei 0110 New Zealand |
12 Nov 2012 - |
Individual | Woodward, Philippa Maureen Dobree |
Whau Valley Whangarei 0112 New Zealand |
12 Nov 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Tw Trustees 2011 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031160360 |
Whangarei 0140 New Zealand |
02 Sep 2014 - |
Individual | Cromie, Sheryl Noeline |
Kamo Whangare 0112 New Zealand |
12 Nov 2012 - |
Director | Cromie, Mark Laurence |
Kamo Whangarei 0112 New Zealand |
12 Nov 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Crowood Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030448933 Company Number: 4103941 |
30 Oct 2019 - 30 Oct 2019 | |
Entity | Crowood Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030448933 Company Number: 4103941 |
30 Oct 2019 - 30 Oct 2019 | |
Entity | Webb Ross Johnson Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037956127 Company Number: 885222 |
12 Nov 2012 - 02 Sep 2014 | |
Entity | Webb Ross Johnson Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037956127 Company Number: 885222 |
12 Nov 2012 - 02 Sep 2014 |
Mark Laurence Cromie - Director
Appointment date: 12 Nov 2012
Address: Kamo, Whangarei, 0112 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Nov 2012
Bryce Rodney Woodward - Director
Appointment date: 12 Nov 2012
Address: Whau Valley, Whangarei, 0112 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Nov 2012
Crowood Limited
67 Porowini Avenue
Francis And Wemyss Limited
Mitre 10 Shop
Whangarei Night-eye Patrol Charitable Trust
Railway Station
Kensington Badminton Club Incorporated
41 Porowini Avenue
Garnet Motor Services Limited
46 Kaka Street
Northland Property Investors Association Incorporated
C/-mike Tasker
French Waldron Limited
44 Kaka Street
Lavender Trustees Limited
20 Commerce Street
Okara Hilltop Limited
Shop 10
Riverside (2012) Limited
35 Commerce Street
Sto Holdings Limited
20 Commerce Street
Top Half Investments Limited
9a Reyburn Street