Queenstown Wharves Gp Limited, a registered company, was registered on 30 Nov 2012. 9429030446250 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Financial asset investing" (business classification K624010) is how the company is classified. The company has been supervised by 6 directors: Alastair Finlay Porter - an active director whose contract began on 30 Nov 2012,
David George Skeggs - an active director whose contract began on 30 Nov 2012,
Christopher Robert Fleck - an active director whose contract began on 28 Nov 2023,
Matthew Day - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Jan 2018 and was terminated on 03 Nov 2023,
Anthony Patrick Mcquilkin - an inactive director whose contract began on 18 Jan 2013 and was terminated on 15 Dec 2017.
Last updated on 15 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 58 Hunter Road, Queenstown, 9371 (type: registered, service).
Queenstown Wharves Gp Limited had been using Unit B 179 Glenda Drive, Frankton, Queenstown as their physical address until 18 Oct 2017.
Other names for this company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 09 Nov 2012 to 19 Dec 2012 they were called Queenstown Wharves Limited.
A total of 300 shares are issued to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 100 shares (33.33%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 100 shares (33.33%). Lastly we have the 3rd share allocation (100 shares 33.33%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous address
Address #1: Unit B 179 Glenda Drive, Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 30 Nov 2012 to 18 Oct 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 300
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 02 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Skeggs Queenstown Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038449833 |
Queenstown 9371 New Zealand |
30 Nov 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Real Journeys Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040267098 |
Te Anau Te Anau 9600 New Zealand |
30 Nov 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Remarkables Jet Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038506451 |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
30 Nov 2012 - |
Alastair Finlay Porter - Director
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2012
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2012
David George Skeggs - Director
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2012
Address: Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2012
Address: Rd 1, Arrowtown, 9371 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Oct 2017
Address: Queenstown, 9371 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Oct 2019
Christopher Robert Fleck - Director
Appointment date: 28 Nov 2023
Address: Te Anau, Te Anau, 9600 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Nov 2023
Matthew Day - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Jan 2018
Termination date: 03 Nov 2023
Address: Queenstown, 9371 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Jan 2018
Anthony Patrick Mcquilkin - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Jan 2013
Termination date: 15 Dec 2017
Address: Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Mar 2014
Craig Douglas Osborne - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2012
Termination date: 18 Feb 2014
Address: Te Anau, Te Anau, 9600 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2012
Mora Limited
69 Buckingham Street
Rua Wines Limited
69 Buckingham Street
Skeggs Group Ventures Limited
69 Buckingham Street
Skeggs Group Management Limited
69 Buckingham Street
Coronet Investments Limited
69 Buckingham Street
Knight One Limited
69 Buckingham Street
Knight One Limited
69 Buckingham Street
Pensell Properties Limited
69 Buckingham Street
Rua Wines Limited
69 Buckingham Street
Skeggs Group Limited
69 Buckingham Street
Skeggs Investments Limited
69 Buckingham Street
Soh Charter Limited
69 Buckingham Street